Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
John Hall vs. Marco Martinez
An Injury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX. Judge Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 20, 2016
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Nueces County, TX
Judge
Hon. Rogoff-Klein, Inna
Category
Injury or Damage - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff/Nonsuit/Non-Final | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit w/Prejudice |
|
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order on Motion to Non-Suit | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Notice of Settlement to Court |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Executed Rule 11 Settlement Agreement |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Designation Defendant S Designation Of Expert Witnesses |
|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Designation Plaintiff's Designation of Experts Witnesses |
|
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Delivery- S Hlumberger E&P Wireline (Employment And Payroll) | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Certificate Of Non-Appearance- John Hall |
|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Plaintiff S Notice Of Cancellation Of Intention To Take Oral Deposition Of Marco Martinez |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Amended Notice Of Intention To Take Deposition By Written Questions | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Delivery- Christus Spohn Hospital Corpus Christi- Shoreline (Radiology) | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Plaintiff S Notice Of Intention To Take Oral Deposition Of Marco Martinez |
|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Delivery- True Medical Imaging Llc (Radiology) | |
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions- Schlumberger Oil Field Service | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice to take Deposition by Written Questions True Medical Imaging LLC | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order JURY TRIAL: 1/29/18 @ 9:00AM |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Call Conference DCC: 3/1/17 @ 10:20am |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit Without Prejudice |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Citation - Marco Martinez |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure |