Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Beneficial Financial I Inc., Successor by Merger to Beneficial Texas Inc. vs. Ralph Velasquez, III,Joan Velasquez
A Foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX. Judge Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 27, 2016
Last Refreshed
June 09, 2023
Filing Location
Nueces County, TX
Judge
Hon. Galvan, Bobby
Category
Foreclosure
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | DWOP Notice Sent | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Citation - Foreclosure Foreclosure/No Charbe, First Class Mail |
|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation - Foreclosure | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Application for an Expedited Order Under Rule 736 on a Home Equity Loan or Home Equity Line of Credit | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet |