Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Velma Roos vs Christopher Kell
A Real Property case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX. Judge Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 22, 2016
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Nueces County, TX
Judge
Hon. Galvan, Bobby
Category
Real Property
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Summary Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Reporter's Certification Deposition Of Velma Roos Taken February 15, 2017 |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of judgment |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment granted |
|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Call MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Judgment for Attorney's Fees |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Defendant's Requested Jury Intructions and Questions |
|
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant s Motion in Limine |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Amended Defendant's First Amended Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Settng Hearing | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Amended Motion for Continuance |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Notice of Setting |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
March 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Daubert/Robinson Challenges | |
March 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Completion of Discovery | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Setting | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
February 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Amendment of Pleadings | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Designation of Experts: Defendant | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Alternative Dispute Resolution | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Designation of Experts: Plaintiff | |
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) DEF. MTN. SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Order on Defendants Special Exceptions | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Appearance of Co-counsel |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Notice of Setting |
|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Amended Defendant's First Amended Special Exceptions, Affirmative Defenses, and Answer |
|
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Joinder of Parties | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Docket Control Order | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Plaintiff's Certificate Of Written Discovery Directed To Defendant Christopher Kell |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Temporary Injunction |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to TRCP 91a and Original Answer |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service for Christopher Kell |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed Original Petition for Declaratory Judgment |