Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In The Matter Of The Marriage Of Michael Patrick Halperin and Moira Kathleen Shiels
A Divorce - No Children case was filed by Halperin, Michael Patrick, against Shiels, Moira Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX. Judge Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 27, 2016
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Nueces County, TX
Category
Divorce - No Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin BVS Form for Order Signed on 12/29/2016 |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
BVS Acceptance Form Information on Suit Affecting the Family Relationship (Excluding Adoptions) |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (5 minutes) |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Nueces County Standing Order | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet No Service Requested |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed Original Petition for Divorce |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet |