Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In The Matter Of The Marriage Of Mitchel D. Beltran and Angela C. Beltran
A Divorce - No Children case was filed by Beltran, Mitchel D., against Beltran, Angela C., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX. Judge Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 26, 2016
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Nueces County, TX
Category
Divorce - No Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin Vitals Form for Order Signed 05/29/2018 |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Decree of Divorce |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Hearing and/or Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Final Hearing and/or Dismissal for Want of Prosecution- May 209,2018 @ 9am |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting DWOP hearing: 5/29/18 @ 9am |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail In Re: Notice of Setting |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Final Divorce- February 21,2017 @ 9am |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Notice of Setting |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Final Divorce Hearing January 27,2017 @ 9 am |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation | |
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet No Service Requested |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Decree Of Divorce |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition |