Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
XXXXX
A Protective Order case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX. Judge Stith, David presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 18, 2016
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Nueces County, TX
Category
Protective Order
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service NPDC Subpoena Returned Served (unknown file stamp date) |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Copy of Protective Order returned with Officer's return from Jim Wells County |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Signed (OCA) Protective Order |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) P.O. (1-2HRS) |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) P.O. |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Subpoena NPDC Subpoena issued on 6/5/18 to Senior Officer, A. Lopez of CCPD returned served by CN1. |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) P.O. |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Texas Crime Information Center Copy of Form and Order mailed to CCPD 5/25/18 /AT |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Agreed Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
May 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Oorder |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Texas Crime Information Center Copy of Form and Order mailed to CCPD 5/7/18 /AT |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Subpoena NPDc Subpoena issued to Senior Officer A. Lopez#9645 on 4/10/18, served on 4/10/18 by CN1 |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order To 04/11/18 @1:30pm | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Texas Crime Information Center TCIC |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
February 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC Data Entry-Extended Temporary Ex Parte PO |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC Form |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order Set 01/05/2018 @9:00am | |
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing & P.O. (1/2 DAY) |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Orde Extending Ex Parte Protective Order To 10/11/17 @1:30pm |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order To 08/11/17 @9:00am | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing & P.O. (2HRS) |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order To 05/31/17 @1:30pm | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (2HRS) |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order To 03/08/17 @9:00am | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Answer to Application for Protective Order |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order To 02/16/17 @1:30pm | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) P.O. |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order Set 02/09/17 @1:30pm | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC Form |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application P.O. |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Subpoena NPDC Subpoena issued to Officer A. Lopez, CCPD on 12/21/16. Returned served by CN1 |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Order To Extend Ex Parte Protective Order To 01/09/17 @1:30pm | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application P.O. |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Agreed Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order To 12/20/16 @1:30pm | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC Form |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Subpoena NPDC Subpoena issued to Senior Officer A. Lopez on 11/30/16. Returned Served by CN1 |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) P.O. (30) |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order 11/29 @ 1:30 PM | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC Form |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice Of An Application For Protective Order | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested (2nd) |
|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order (Notice) | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Subpoena NPDC Subpoena issued on 10/24/16 to Senior Officer, A. Lopez #9645 returned served by CN1. |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order & Order Setting Hearing for 10/31/16 @1:30pm |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application for Protective Order (Notice) Esmer / Co. Attny Office X: 0391 |
|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Application For A Protective Order | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Identifier |
|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet |