Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WESLACO ISD, ET. AL. VS ARMANDO GUTIERREZ, JR., ET. AL.
A Tax Cases (Oca) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX. Judge Rodolfo Delgado presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 15, 2003
Last Refreshed
December 30, 2021
Filing Location
Hidalgo County, TX
Category
Tax Cases (OCA)
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
General Tax
Status
Want of Prosecution
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit, Signed ORDER FOR NONSUIT, SIGNED (OFN) ORDER FOR NONSUIT, SIGNED (OFN) |
|
April 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Defendants Privilege Log Global Disposition: Defendants Privilege Log Global Disposition: Defendants Privilege Log |
|
April 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Disposition ($DISP) ($DISP) |
|
March 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, FILED. (MFNS) Motion for Non-Suit, Filed MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, FILED. (MFNS) |
|
March 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Trial Before The Court (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy") nonsuited Result: Case Dismissed nonsuited |
|
March 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit, Signed ORDER FOR NONSUIT, SIGNED (OFN) Vol./Book 82, Page 930 ORDER FOR NONSUIT, SIGNED (OFN) |
|
March 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, FILED. (MFNS) Motion for Non-Suit, Filed MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, FILED. (MFNS) |
|
February 09, 2005 | Docket Event | Trial Before The Court (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy") Result: Reset | |
September 07, 2004 | Docket Event |
Trial Before The Court (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy") Juan Gonzalez in Fed Ct. - attys agreed to reset Result: Hearing Passed Juan Gonzalez in Fed Ct. - attys agreed to reset |
|
July 26, 2004 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order, Signed T-1379-03-B 07/26/2004 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER SET FOR TRIAL 9/7/04 @ 10:00 AM DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, SIGNED (DCOS) T-1379-03-B 07/26/2004 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER SET FOR TRIAL 9/7/04 @ 10:00 AM DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, SIGNED (DCOS) |
|
July 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy") conf w/Joel conf w/Joel |
|
June 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference T-1379-03-B 06/15/2004 DOCKET CONTROL CONFE SET FOR 7/15/04 @ 2:30 PM DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (DCC) T-1379-03-B 06/15/2004 DOCKET CONTROL CONFE SET FOR 7/15/04 @ 2:30 PM DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (DCC) |
|
June 04, 2004 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Docket Control Conference, Filed MOTION TO SET DCC, FILED (MOT.DCC) MOTION TO SET DCC, FILED (MOT.DCC) |
|
June 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Plea of Intervention T-1379-03-B 06/02/2004 PLEA OF INTERVENTION CITY OF WESLACO PLEA OF INTERVENTION, FILED (PLEA) T-1379-03-B 06/02/2004 PLEA OF INTERVENTION CITY OF WESLACO PLEA OF INTERVENTION, FILED (PLEA) |
|
February 05, 2004 | Docket Event |
General Denial, Filed T-1379-03-B 02/05/2004 GENERAL DENIAL, FILE ARMANDO GUTIERREZ JR & ANA B GUTIERREZ, FILED GENERAL DENIAL, FILED (GEN.DEN) T-1379-03-B 02/05/2004 GENERAL DENIAL, FILE ARMANDO GUTIERREZ JR & ANA B GUTIERREZ, FILED GENERAL DENIAL, FILED (GEN.DEN) |
|
January 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned T-1379-03-B 01/21/2004 CITATION RETURNED ANA & ARMANDO GUTIERREZ JR BOTH SERVED 1/16/04, FILED CITATION RETURNED (CIT.R) T-1379-03-B 01/21/2004 CITATION RETURNED ANA & ARMANDO GUTIERREZ JR BOTH SERVED 1/16/04, FILED CITATION RETURNED (CIT.R) |
|
January 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued T-1379-03-B 01/09/2004 CITATION ISSUED 2 TO ANA B & ARMANDO GUTIERREZ JR CITATION ISSUED (CIT.I) Citation Issued T-1379-03-B 01/09/2004 CITATION ISSUED 2 TO ANA B & ARMANDO GUTIERREZ JR CITATION ISSUED (CIT.I) |
|
December 15, 2003 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) PLAINTIFF'S Original Petition (POP) PLAINTIFF'S Original Petition (POP) |