Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Maria Perez VS. U.S. Renal Care, Inc., Advanced Cardiac and Trauma Emergency Medical Services, Intercity Ambulance for Emergency Medical Transport, LLC, Advanced Cardiac and Trauma Emergency Medical Services
An Injury Or Damage - Other (Oca) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 13, 2022
Last Refreshed
March 09, 2024
Filing Location
Hidalgo County, TX
Category
Injury or Damage - Other (OCA)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT U.S. RENAL CARE, INC.
CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT ADVANCED CARDIAC AND TRAUMA EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES
CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT INTERCITY AMBULANCE FOR EMERGENCY MEDICAL TRANSPORT, LLC
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: Mar 01, 2024Order, Signed
Date: Mar 01, 2024Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: Mar 01, 2024Order, Signed
Date: Feb 13, 2024Amended
Date: Feb 08, 2024Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: Feb 05, 2024Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: Jan 31, 2024Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: Jan 26, 2024Rule 11 Agreement
Date: Jan 26, 2024Motion
Date: Jan 24, 2024Motion
Date: Jan 24, 2024Order Filed
Date: Jan 24, 2024Order Filed
Date: Jan 24, 2024Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: Dec 27, 2023Order, Signed
Date: Nov 21, 2023Rule 11 Agreement
Date: Sep 14, 2023Amended
Date: Sep 12, 2023Motion
Date: Sep 11, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: Sep 06, 2023Order, Signed
Date: Aug 09, 2023Motion
Date: Aug 02, 2023Order Filed
Date: Aug 02, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: Jun 21, 2023Order Signed
Date: May 31, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: May 26, 2023Order Signed
Date: May 16, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: Mar 23, 2023Request
Date: Feb 21, 2023Answer
Date: Feb 21, 2023Service Returned - Served
Date: Feb 07, 2023Citation Issued
Date: Feb 01, 2023Amended
Date: Jan 31, 2023Answer
Date: Nov 29, 2022Answer
Date: Nov 18, 2022Service Returned - Served
Date: Oct 26, 2022Citation Issued
Date: Sep 15, 2022Citation Issued
Date: Sep 15, 2022Original Petition (OCA)
Date: Sep 13, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits Other CANCELED Trial on Merits (1:30 PM) () Other |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Trial on Merits (1:30 PM) () | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing Other CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) () Other |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) () | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing Other CANCELED Status Conference Hearing (9:00 AM) () Other ***Mandatory Trial Status*** Pre-Trial: 04/18/2024 Trial: 04/22/22024 |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing (9:00 AM) () ***Mandatory Trial Status*** Pre-Trial: 04/18/2024 Trial: 04/22/22024 ***Mandatory Trial Status*** Pre-Trial: 04/18/2024 Trial: 04/22/22024 |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (2:30 PM) () | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed SECOND CROSS-NOTICE OF DEFENDANT U.S. RENAL CARE, INC???S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE THE ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ SECOND CROSS-NOTICE OF DEFENDANT U.S. RENAL CARE, INC???S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE THE ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Order Re-Setting Telephonic Docket Control Conference Order Re-Setting Telephonic Docket Control Conference |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed PLAINTIFF???S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE THE ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF RICARDO F. VAIZ WITH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM PLAINTIFF???S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE THE ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF RICARDO F. VAIZ WITH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER RE-SETTING TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE ORDER RE-SETTING TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (3:00 PM) () | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Continuance Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Continuance |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Amended Cross-Notice of Defendant U.S. renal Care, Inc.'s First Amended Notice of Intention to Take the Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Maria Perez Cross-Notice of Defendant U.S. renal Care, Inc.'s First Amended Notice of Intention to Take the Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Maria Perez |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Plaintiff's Cross Notice of Defendant U.S. Renal Care, Inc.'s Notice of Intention to Take the Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Ricardo F. Vaiz with Subpoena Duces Tecum Plaintiff's Cross Notice of Defendant U.S. Renal Care, Inc.'s Notice of Intention to Take the Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Ricardo F. Vaiz with Subpoena Duces Tecum |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel Notice of Appearance of Counsel |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Cross-Notice of Defendant U.S. Renal Care, Inc.'s Notice of Intention to Take the Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Maria Perez Cross-Notice of Defendant U.S. Renal Care, Inc.'s Notice of Intention to Take the Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Maria Perez |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Rule 11 |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue RULE 11 AGREEMENT RULE 11 AGREEMENT |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion ACT EMS' Motion to Quash Deposition of Ricardo Vaiz ACT EMS' Motion to Quash Deposition of Ricardo Vaiz |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Continuance Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Continuance |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order Setting Hearing Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Continuance Order Setting Hearing Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Continuance |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order Granting ACT EMS' Motion to Quash Deposition of Ricardo Vaiz AS PER COURT: NEEDS ORDER SETTING HEARING Order Granting ACT EMS' Motion to Quash Deposition of Ricardo Vaiz AS PER COURT: NEEDS ORDER SETTING HEARING |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION |
|
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Cross Notice of Defendant U.S. Renal Care, Inc's Notice of Intention to Take the Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Maria Perez Cross Notice of Defendant U.S. Renal Care, Inc's Notice of Intention to Take the Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Maria Perez |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Agreed Docket Control Order Agreed Docket Control Order |
|
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue AGREED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AGREED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Attorney Agreement CANCELED Hearing (9:00 AM) () Attorney Agreement Defendant's Advance Cardiac and Trauma Emergency Medical Services Traditional & No Evidence Motion for SJ |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement passing 9/18 MSJ hearing Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Agreement passing 9/18 MSJ hearing |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue RULE 11 AGREEMENT RULE 11 AGREEMENT |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Plaintiff's First Amended Motion for Continuance Plaintiff's First Amended Motion for Continuance |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Notice of Change of Address Notice of Change of Address |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Order Setting Hearing Order Setting Hearing |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant ACT EMS' Traditional and No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant ACT EMS' Traditional and No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order Granting Defendant ACT EMS' Traditional and No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment Order Granting Defendant ACT EMS' Traditional and No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tickler (4:30 PM) () Was DCO Submitted by Samantha from Law Office of Bobby Garcia, P.C?? Was DCO Submitted by Samantha from Law Office of Bobby Garcia, P.C?? |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Def. Intercity Ambulance for Emergency Medical Transport, LLC's Certificate of Written Discovery (Ans & Resp to U.S. Renal Care's ROGS & RFP) Def. Intercity Ambulance for Emergency Medical Transport, LLC's Certificate of Written Discovery (Ans & Resp to U.S. Renal Care's ROGS & RFP) |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference HELD W/ SAMANTHA ON BEHALF OF BOBBY GARCIA (P) & CHASTITI N. HORNE (D) & RAFAEL GARCIA (D) & ALY GARCIA ON BEHALF OF JAMES THOMPSON (D) MS: 04/01/2024; PRE-TRIAL: 04/18/2024; TRIAL: 04/22/2024 HELD W/ SAMANTHA ON BEHALF OF BOBBY GARCIA (P) & CHASTITI N. HORNE (D) & RAFAEL GARCIA (D) & ALY GARCIA ON BEHALF OF JAMES THOMPSON (D) MS: 04/01/2024; PRE-TRIAL: 04/18/2024; TRIAL: 04/22/2024 |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (3:00 PM) () | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Signed Order Resetting Telephonic Docket Control Conference Order Resetting Telephonic Docket Control Conference |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORSTDCC ORSTDCC |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (3:00 PM) () | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Defendant Intercity Ambulance for Emergency Medical Transport, LLC's Certificate of Written Discovery (ROGS, RFP & RFA TO PLAINTIFF) Defendant Intercity Ambulance for Emergency Medical Transport, LLC's Certificate of Written Discovery (ROGS, RFP & RFA TO PLAINTIFF) |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Signed Order Setting Telephonic Docket Control Conference Order Setting Telephonic Docket Control Conference |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Defendant Intercity Ambulance for Emergency Medical Transport, LLCs Certificate of Written Discovery Defendant Intercity Ambulance for Emergency Medical Transport, LLCs Certificate of Written Discovery |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request DEFENDANT INTERCITY AMBULANCE FOR EMERGENCY MEDICAL TRANSPORT, LLC's JURY DEMAND DEFENDANT INTERCITY AMBULANCE FOR EMERGENCY MEDICAL TRANSPORT, LLC's JURY DEMAND |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer DEFENDANT INTERCITY AMBULANCE FOR EMERGENCY MEDICAL TRANSPORT, LLC's ORIGINAL ANSWER DEFENDANT INTERCITY AMBULANCE FOR EMERGENCY MEDICAL TRANSPORT, LLC's ORIGINAL ANSWER |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned - Served RETURN OF SERVICE- Intercity Ambulance RETURN OF SERVICE- Intercity Ambulance |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation INTERCITY AMBULANCE Citation Issued Citation INTERCITY AMBULANCE |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Plaintiff's First Amended Petition with Discovery Requests Plaintiff's First Amended Petition with Discovery Requests |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer Original Answer of Advanced Cardiac and Trauma Emergency Medical Services Original Answer of Advanced Cardiac and Trauma Emergency Medical Services |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer Defendant U.S. Renal Care, Inc.'s Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition Defendant U.S. Renal Care, Inc.'s Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Returned - Served RETURN OF SERVICE RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Returned - Served RETURN OF SERVICE - Advanced Cardiac and Trauma Emergency Medical Services RETURN OF SERVICE - Advanced Cardiac and Trauma Emergency Medical Services |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued CITATION ISSUED TO US RENAL CARE INC Citation Issued CITATION ISSUED TO US RENAL CARE INC |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued CITATION ISSUED TO ADVANCED CARDIAC Citation Issued CITATION ISSUED TO ADVANCED CARDIAC |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Plaintiff's Original Petition with Discovery Requests Plaintiff's Original Petition with Discovery Requests |