Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DOLORES MARIA MARTINEZ VS. GILBERTO HERNANDEZ
An Injury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) case was filed by Martinez, Dolores, represented by Reginaldo Ramirez, against Hernandez, Gilberto, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 19, 2023
Last Refreshed
October 23, 2023
Filing Location
Hidalgo County, TX
Category
Injury or Damage - Motor Vehicle (OCA)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Active
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a Plaintiff's Original Petition and Required Disclosures filed by Dolores Maria Martinez against Gilberto Hernandez in the Hidalgo County District Court in Texas. The Plaintiff, Dolores Maria Martinez, alleges that on April 13, …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Citation Issued
Date: Oct 20, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: Oct 19, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation HERNANDEZ, GILBERTO Unserved | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) AND REQUIRED DISCLOSURES AND REQUIRED DISCLOSURES |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid |