Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Victor Safar, Jr. VS. Pure Energy, Inc.
A Contract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt (Oca) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX. Judge Librado Keno Vasquez presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 18, 2023
Last Refreshed
April 04, 2024
Filing Location
Hidalgo County, TX
Filing Court House
398th District Court
Category
Contract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt (OCA)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Active
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed by Victor Safar Jr. against Pure Energy Inc. in the District Court of Hidalgo County, Texas. Victor Safar Jr. is the plaintiff, and Pure Energy Inc. is the defendant. The complaint alleges that Pure Energy…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Proposed Order
Date: Apr 01, 2024Response
Date: Apr 01, 2024Exhibit
Date: Apr 01, 2024Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: Mar 20, 2024Notice Sent
Date: Mar 19, 2024Notice Sent
Date: Mar 07, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: Mar 07, 2024Order Setting Hearing
Date: Feb 02, 2024Proposed Order
Date: Jan 18, 2024Order Returned by Court
Date: Jan 18, 2024Defendants Original Answer
Date: Jan 18, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: Jan 18, 2024Service Issued
Date: Sep 25, 2023Request for Service
Date: Sep 19, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: Sep 18, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Called atty hector salinas, atty david augustus present. crt granted defs. motion to compel arbitration atty hector salinas, atty david augustus present. crt granted defs. motion to compel arbitration |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") Arbitration (DEFs) Arbitration (DEFs) |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order DENYING DEFENDANT PURE ENERGY INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION DENYING DEFENDANT PURE ENERGY INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Response TO DEFENDANT PURE ENERGY INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION TO DEFENDANT PURE ENERGY INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibit | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue DENYING DEFENDANT PURE ENERGY INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION DENYING DEFENDANT PURE ENERGY INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing, Filed WITH EXHIBIT WITH EXHIBIT |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed defs motion to compel arbitration set for 4/02/24 @ 8:00 a.m. defs motion to compel arbitration set for 4/02/24 @ 8:00 a.m. |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER TO COMPEL ARBITRATION ORDER TO COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER TO COMPEL ARBITRATION ORDER TO COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendant's Original Answer | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER TO COMPEL ARBITRATION ORDER TO COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Issued Service Issued |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation Pure Energy, Inc. Served 01/10/2024 Returned 01/11/2024 | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Service | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) AND REQUESTS FOR DISCLOSURE AND REQUESTS FOR DISCLOSURE |