Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ALANIZ, SANTIAGO et al vs MUNOZ, MARIA S.
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX. Judge Aida Salinas Flores presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2003
Last Refreshed
July 11, 2023
Filing Location
Hidalgo County, TX
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order of Dismissal, Signed
Date: Dec 18, 2006Motion
Date: Dec 08, 2006Order
Date: Mar 31, 2006Agreed Order of Dismissal, Signed
Date: Aug 17, 2004Motion
Date: Aug 05, 2004Order Signed
Date: Jun 30, 2004Motion
Date: May 27, 2004Answer
Date: Jan 12, 2004Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA)
Date: Dec 05, 2003Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Scanned Fee Sheet | |
May 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived COURT COST/$0.00/WAIVED/REFUND (C/C) COURT COST/$0.00/WAIVED/REFUND (C/C) |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice Mailed C-3042-03-I 12/21/2006 NOTICE MAILED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NOTICE MAILED (NM) C-3042-03-I 12/21/2006 NOTICE MAILED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NOTICE MAILED (NM) |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal, Signed C-3042-03-I 12/18/2006 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, BY JUDGE ASF/MPF ORDER OF DISMISSAL, SIGNED (OOD) C-3042-03-I 12/18/2006 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, BY JUDGE ASF/MPF ORDER OF DISMISSAL, SIGNED (OOD) |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Disposition ($DISP) ($DISP) |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION (DISP) Disposition DISPOSITION (DISP) |
|
December 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion C-3042-03-I 12/08/2006 MOTION AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS,FILED MOTION (MOT) C-3042-03-I 12/08/2006 MOTION AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS,FILED MOTION (MOT) |
|
November 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Tickler (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Salinas Flores, Aida) FINAL ORDER SHOULD HAVE BEEN SUBMITTED FINAL ORDER SHOULD HAVE BEEN SUBMITTED |
|
October 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Court Entries C-3042-03-I 10/16/2006 COURT ENTRIES CASE CALLED MICHAEL FLANAGAN AND ROSEMARY CONRAD SANDOVAL APPEARED REQUESTED 45 PANEL JURY/ATTYS ANNOUNCED TO COURT CASE SETTLED OTBS BY 11/6/06/MPF COURT ENTRIES (COURT) C-3042-03-I 10/16/2006 COURT ENTRIES CASE CALLED MICHAEL FLANAGAN AND ROSEMARY CONRAD SANDOVAL APPEARED REQUESTED 45 PANEL JURY/ATTYS ANNOUNCED TO COURT CASE SETTLED OTBS BY 11/6/06/MPF COURT ENTRIES (COURT) |
|
October 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion C-3042-03-I 10/16/2006 MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE, FILED. MOTION (MOT) C-3042-03-I 10/16/2006 MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE, FILED. MOTION (MOT) |
|
October 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Court Entries C-3042-03-I 10/12/2006 COURT ENTRIES CASE CALLED ZULAIDA LOPEZ APPEARED NOTHING TO PRETRY; ANNOUNCED READY FOR TRIAL NEED TO REQUEST JURY PANEL OF 45/MPF COURT ENTRIES (COURT) C-3042-03-I 10/12/2006 COURT ENTRIES CASE CALLED ZULAIDA LOPEZ APPEARED NOTHING TO PRETRY; ANNOUNCED READY FOR TRIAL NEED TO REQUEST JURY PANEL OF 45/MPF COURT ENTRIES (COURT) |
|
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice Mailed C-3042-03-I 05/22/2006 NOTICE MAILED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE, NOTICE MAILED (NM) C-3042-03-I 05/22/2006 NOTICE MAILED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE, NOTICE MAILED (NM) |
|
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order C-3042-03-I 05/19/2006 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE ASF/MPF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (DCO) C-3042-03-I 05/19/2006 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE ASF/MPF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (DCO) |
|
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Tickler (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Salinas Flores, Aida) check if dco filed check if dco filed |
|
May 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing C-3042-03-I 05/17/2006 ORDER SETTING HEARIN ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE, FILED ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) C-3042-03-I 05/17/2006 ORDER SETTING HEARIN ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE, FILED ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) |
|
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Phone Call C-3042-03-I 05/16/2006 PHONE CALL W/ROSI OF MICHAEL FLANAGAN'S OFFICE ADVISED WE HAVE NOT RECEIVED THE DCO ORDER YET;TO PLEASE FILE IT WITH THE CLERK OF THE COURT AT THE EARLIEST POSSIBLE/MPF PHONE CALL (P/C) C-3042-03-I 05/16/2006 PHONE CALL W/ROSI OF MICHAEL FLANAGAN'S OFFICE ADVISED WE HAVE NOT RECEIVED THE DCO ORDER YET;TO PLEASE FILE IT WITH THE CLERK OF THE COURT AT THE EARLIEST POSSIBLE/MPF PHONE CALL (P/C) |
|
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Phone Call C-3042-03-I 04/21/2006 PHONE CALL MARY W/ ROSEMARY CONRAD SANDOVAL CALLED - WANTED TRIAL DATES - I GAVE HER DATES FROM DCC ON 4-13-06 - SL PHONE CALL (P/C) C-3042-03-I 04/21/2006 PHONE CALL MARY W/ ROSEMARY CONRAD SANDOVAL CALLED - WANTED TRIAL DATES - I GAVE HER DATES FROM DCC ON 4-13-06 - SL PHONE CALL (P/C) |
|
April 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference C-3042-03-I 04/13/2006 DOCKET CONTROL CONFE CONDUCTED ROSIE OF MICHAEL FLANAGAN'S OFFICE MS. SANDOVAL COULD NOT BE PRESENT AND GAVE DATES SHE WAS AVAILABLE WE SET JT FOR 10.16.06 AT 8:30 A.M/ AND PTH WILL BE OCTOBER 12, 2006 AT 8:30 A.M./ 30 PRIOR DAYS MANDATORY MEDIATION; ROSIE TO SUBMIT DCO/CRIMINAL TRIAL TAKE PRECEDENCE/MPF DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (DCC) C-3042-03-I 04/13/2006 DOCKET CONTROL CONFE CONDUCTED ROSIE OF MICHAEL FLANAGAN'S OFFICE MS. SANDOVAL COULD NOT BE PRESENT AND GAVE DATES SHE WAS AVAILABLE WE SET JT FOR 10.16.06 AT 8:30 A.M/ AND PTH WILL BE OCTOBER 12, 2006 AT 8:30 A.M./ 30 PRIOR DAYS MANDATORY MEDIATION; ROSIE TO SUBMIT DCO/CRIMINAL TRIAL TAKE PRECEDENCE/MPF DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (DCC) |
|
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Dismissal Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salinas Flores, Aida) | |
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order C-3042-03-I 03/31/2006 ORDER FILED ORDER SETTING DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE, FILED ORDER FILED (ORDERF) C-3042-03-I 03/31/2006 ORDER FILED ORDER SETTING DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE, FILED ORDER FILED (ORDERF) |
|
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed C-3042-03-I 03/31/2006 MOTION FOR DOCKET CO MOTION REQUESTING DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE, FILED MOTION FOR DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (MOTDCC) C-3042-03-I 03/31/2006 MOTION FOR DOCKET CO MOTION REQUESTING DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE, FILED MOTION FOR DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (MOTDCC) |
|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
DWOP Notice Sent DWOP NOTICES SENT (DW.S) DWOP NOTICES SENT (DW.S) |
|
April 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certification C-3042-03-I 04/12/2005 CERTIFICATION REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF MARIA S., FILED CERTIFICATION (CERTIFICATION) C-3042-03-I 04/12/2005 CERTIFICATION REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF MARIA S., FILED CERTIFICATION (CERTIFICATION) |
|
April 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certification C-3042-03-I 04/12/2005 CERTIFICATION REPORTERS CERTIFICATION DEPOSITION OF SANTIAGO JIMMY ALANIZ, FILED CERTIFICATION (CERTIFICATION) C-3042-03-I 04/12/2005 CERTIFICATION REPORTERS CERTIFICATION DEPOSITION OF SANTIAGO JIMMY ALANIZ, FILED CERTIFICATION (CERTIFICATION) |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Trial on Merits (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salinas Flores, Aida) | |
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Court Entries C-3042-03-I 02/28/2005 COURT ENTRIES NOA; ATTYS TO SUBMIT DCC ORDER/MPF COURT ENTRIES (COURT) C-3042-03-I 02/28/2005 COURT ENTRIES NOA; ATTYS TO SUBMIT DCC ORDER/MPF COURT ENTRIES (COURT) |
|
February 24, 2005 | Docket Event | Pre Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salinas Flores, Aida) | |
February 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certification C-3042-03-I 02/24/2005 CERTIFICATION FILED. CERTIFICATION (CERTIFICATION) C-3042-03-I 02/24/2005 CERTIFICATION FILED. CERTIFICATION (CERTIFICATION) |
|
February 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Court Entries C-3042-03-I 02/24/2005 COURT ENTRIES ATTY FLANAGAN AND ROSE SANDOVAL WILL HAVE A POSSIBLE AGREEMENT WILL SUBMIT A DCC ORDER/MPF COURT ENTRIES (COURT) C-3042-03-I 02/24/2005 COURT ENTRIES ATTY FLANAGAN AND ROSE SANDOVAL WILL HAVE A POSSIBLE AGREEMENT WILL SUBMIT A DCC ORDER/MPF COURT ENTRIES (COURT) |
|
February 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Amended C-3042-03-I 02/18/2005 AMENDED DEFENDANT'S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER, FILED AMENDED (AME) C-3042-03-I 02/18/2005 AMENDED DEFENDANT'S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER, FILED AMENDED (AME) |
|
February 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certification C-3042-03-I 02/16/2005 CERTIFICATION CITY HALL, FILED CERTIFICATION (CERTIFICATION) C-3042-03-I 02/16/2005 CERTIFICATION CITY HALL, FILED CERTIFICATION (CERTIFICATION) |
|
February 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certification C-3042-03-I 02/16/2005 CERTIFICATION FILED CERTIFICATION (CERTIFICATION) C-3042-03-I 02/16/2005 CERTIFICATION FILED CERTIFICATION (CERTIFICATION) |
|
January 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice C-3042-03-I 01/19/2005 NOTICE NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION ON WRITTEN QUESTION, FILED NOTICE (NOTICE) C-3042-03-I 01/19/2005 NOTICE NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION ON WRITTEN QUESTION, FILED NOTICE (NOTICE) |
|
December 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice C-3042-03-I 12/10/2004 NOTICE MEDINCAL RECORDS OF DR. AUGUSTO CASTRILON, FILED NOTICE (NOTICE) C-3042-03-I 12/10/2004 NOTICE MEDINCAL RECORDS OF DR. AUGUSTO CASTRILON, FILED NOTICE (NOTICE) |
|
December 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice C-3042-03-I 12/10/2004 NOTICE BILLING RECORDS OF DR. AUGUTO A CASTRILLON, FILED NOTICE (NOTICE) C-3042-03-I 12/10/2004 NOTICE BILLING RECORDS OF DR. AUGUTO A CASTRILLON, FILED NOTICE (NOTICE) |
|
November 12, 2004 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NOTICE) Notice NOTICE (NOTICE) |
|
October 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice C-3042-03-I 10/20/2004 NOTICE RADIOLOGY ASS. OF MCALLEN BILLING RE: SANTIAGO ALANIZ NOTICE (NOTICE) C-3042-03-I 10/20/2004 NOTICE RADIOLOGY ASS. OF MCALLEN BILLING RE: SANTIAGO ALANIZ NOTICE (NOTICE) |
|
October 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice C-3042-03-I 10/20/2004 NOTICE NOLANA OPEN MRI CENTER BILLING RE: SANTIAGO ALANIZ NOTICE (NOTICE) C-3042-03-I 10/20/2004 NOTICE NOLANA OPEN MRI CENTER BILLING RE: SANTIAGO ALANIZ NOTICE (NOTICE) |
|
October 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice C-3042-03-I 10/20/2004 NOTICE NOLANA OPEN MRI MEDICAL RE: SANTIAGO ALANIZ NOTICE (NOTICE) C-3042-03-I 10/20/2004 NOTICE NOLANA OPEN MRI MEDICAL RE: SANTIAGO ALANIZ NOTICE (NOTICE) |
|
October 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice C-3042-03-I 10/20/2004 NOTICE BILLING FOR SANTIAGO ALANIZ NOTICE (NOTICE) C-3042-03-I 10/20/2004 NOTICE BILLING FOR SANTIAGO ALANIZ NOTICE (NOTICE) |
|
October 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice C-3042-03-I 10/20/2004 NOTICE FILED RGV ORTHO CENTER, PA NOTICE (NOTICE) C-3042-03-I 10/20/2004 NOTICE FILED RGV ORTHO CENTER, PA NOTICE (NOTICE) |
|
August 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Copies Mailed to Attorney(s) C-3042-03-I 08/18/2004 COPIES MAILED TO ATT AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO JUAN AREVALO ONLY COPIES MAILED TO ATTY(S) (COPY) C-3042-03-I 08/18/2004 COPIES MAILED TO ATT AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO JUAN AREVALO ONLY COPIES MAILED TO ATTY(S) (COPY) |
|
August 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order of Dismissal, Signed C-3042-03-I 08/17/2004 AGREED ORDER OF DISM AS TO JUAN AREVALO ONLY AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL, SIGNED (AOOD) Vol./Book 935, Page 555 C-3042-03-I 08/17/2004 AGREED ORDER OF DISM AS TO JUAN AREVALO ONLY AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL, SIGNED (AOOD) |
|
August 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
File Sent to District Clerk FILE SENT TO DIST CLERK (FSTDC) FILE SENT TO DIST CLERK (FSTDC) |
|
August 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
File Sent to District Court FILE SENT TO DIST. COURT (FSTRC) FILE SENT TO DIST. COURT (FSTRC) |
|
August 05, 2004 | Docket Event |
Motion C-3042-03-I 08/05/2004 MOTION AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS AS TO CLAIMS OF JUAN AREVALO ONLY, FILED. MOTION (MOT) C-3042-03-I 08/05/2004 MOTION AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS AS TO CLAIMS OF JUAN AREVALO ONLY, FILED. MOTION (MOT) |
|
July 01, 2004 | Docket Event |
Copies Mailed to Attorney(s) C-3042-03-I 07/01/2004 COPIES MAILED TO ATT ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE COPIES MAILED TO ATTY(S) (COPY) C-3042-03-I 07/01/2004 COPIES MAILED TO ATT ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE COPIES MAILED TO ATTY(S) (COPY) |
|
June 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order Signed C-3042-03-I 06/30/2004 ORDER, SIGNED PT 2/24/05 @ 8:30 AM TM 2/28/05 @ 8:30 AM ORDER, SIGNED (OS) C-3042-03-I 06/30/2004 ORDER, SIGNED PT 2/24/05 @ 8:30 AM TM 2/28/05 @ 8:30 AM ORDER, SIGNED (OS) |
|
June 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
File Sent to District Clerk FILE SENT TO DIST CLERK (FSTDC) FILE SENT TO DIST CLERK (FSTDC) |
|
June 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Phone Call C-3042-03-I 06/29/2004 PHONE CALL TCW-ROSIE (MICHAEL FLANAGAN)/LETTY(ROSEMARY SANDOVAL). PT 2/24/05 @ 8:30 AM TM 2/28/05 @ 8:30 AM DEADLINES-TRCP 3-4 DAYS OTBS ROSIE PHONE CALL (P/C) C-3042-03-I 06/29/2004 PHONE CALL TCW-ROSIE (MICHAEL FLANAGAN)/LETTY(ROSEMARY SANDOVAL). PT 2/24/05 @ 8:30 AM TM 2/28/05 @ 8:30 AM DEADLINES-TRCP 3-4 DAYS OTBS ROSIE PHONE CALL (P/C) |
|
June 29, 2004 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Salinas Flores, Aida) | |
June 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
File Sent to District Clerk FILE SENT TO DIST CLERK (FSTDC) FILE SENT TO DIST CLERK (FSTDC) |
|
June 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Copies Mailed to Attorney(s) C-3042-03-I 06/16/2004 COPIES MAILED TO ATT DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE 6.29.04 COPIES MAILED TO ATTY(S) (COPY) C-3042-03-I 06/16/2004 COPIES MAILED TO ATT DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE 6.29.04 COPIES MAILED TO ATTY(S) (COPY) |
|
June 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing C-3042-03-I 06/16/2004 ORDER SETTING HEARIN DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE-6/29/04 @ 8:30 AM ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) C-3042-03-I 06/16/2004 ORDER SETTING HEARIN DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE-6/29/04 @ 8:30 AM ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) |
|
June 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
File Sent to District Court FILE SENT TO DIST. COURT (FSTRC) FILE SENT TO DIST. COURT (FSTRC) |
|
May 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
Motion C-3042-03-I 05/27/2004 MOTION MOTION REQUESTING DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE, FILED. MOTION (MOT) C-3042-03-I 05/27/2004 MOTION MOTION REQUESTING DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE, FILED. MOTION (MOT) |
|
May 25, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice C-3042-03-I 05/25/2004 NOTICE FILED. (4) NOTICE (NOTICE) C-3042-03-I 05/25/2004 NOTICE FILED. (4) NOTICE (NOTICE) |
|
January 12, 2004 | Docket Event |
Answer C-3042-03-I 01/12/2004 ANSWER DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER,FILED ATTORENY JEFFREY ROERIG 956-542-5666 ANSWER (ANS) C-3042-03-I 01/12/2004 ANSWER DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER,FILED ATTORENY JEFFREY ROERIG 956-542-5666 ANSWER (ANS) |
|
December 29, 2003 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned C-3042-03-I 12/29/2003 CITATION RETURNED MARIA S. MUNOZ SERVED 12.24.03, FILED. CITATION RETURNED (CIT.R) C-3042-03-I 12/29/2003 CITATION RETURNED MARIA S. MUNOZ SERVED 12.24.03, FILED. CITATION RETURNED (CIT.R) |
|
December 23, 2003 | Docket Event |
Return Receipt Received C-3042-03-I 12/23/2003 RETURN RECEIPT RECEI MARIA S. MUNOZ, SERVED 12.17.03, FILED. RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED (RRR) C-3042-03-I 12/23/2003 RETURN RECEIPT RECEI MARIA S. MUNOZ, SERVED 12.17.03, FILED. RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED (RRR) |
|
December 18, 2003 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued C-3042-03-I 12/18/2003 CITATION ISSUED MARIA S. MUNOZ HAND DELIVERED TO:RUDY CITATION ISSUED (CIT.I) Citation Issued C-3042-03-I 12/18/2003 CITATION ISSUED MARIA S. MUNOZ HAND DELIVERED TO:RUDY CITATION ISSUED (CIT.I) |
|
December 12, 2003 | Docket Event |
Citation by Certified Mail, Issued (Fee) C-3042-03-I 12/12/2003 CITATION BY C/M ISSU MARIA S. MUNOZ CITATION BY C/M ISSUED (CM.I) C-3042-03-I 12/12/2003 CITATION BY C/M ISSU MARIA S. MUNOZ CITATION BY C/M ISSUED (CM.I) |
|
December 05, 2003 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION (POP) PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION (POP) |