Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
EMILIA JIMENEZ vs. THE FURNITURE MART, INC. ET AL
An All Other Civil Cases (Oca) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX. Judge Ramirez, Mario presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 03, 2003
Last Refreshed
July 11, 2023
Filing Location
Hidalgo County, TX
Category
All Other Civil Cases (OCA)
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order of Dismissal, Signed
Date: May 27, 2008Motion
Date: Mar 04, 2008Motion
Date: Feb 20, 2008Order Signed
Date: Nov 19, 2007Notice of Intent to Dismiss
Date: Nov 15, 2007Motion
Date: Oct 15, 2007Response
Date: Sep 04, 2007Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: Aug 23, 2007Response
Date: Aug 15, 2007Objection
Date: Aug 15, 2007Order Denying Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: Jun 13, 2007Reply
Date: Jun 04, 2007Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: May 29, 2007Response
Date: May 29, 2007Response
Date: May 24, 2007Motion for Reconsideration, Filed
Date: May 18, 2007Reply
Date: Apr 10, 2007Response
Date: Apr 05, 2007Order Signed
Date: Feb 01, 2007Response
Date: Dec 19, 2006Motion
Date: Dec 11, 2006Response
Date: Nov 03, 2006Response
Date: Nov 02, 2006Motion
Date: Oct 23, 2006Answer
Date: Sep 28, 2006Motion
Date: Jul 18, 2006Demand
Date: May 09, 2006Response
Date: Mar 07, 2006Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Scanned Fee Sheet | |
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Bill of Cost BILLED (B) BILLED (B) |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Scanned Fee Sheet C-3021-03-F 07/06/2009 SCANNED FEE SHEET PLT'S BALANCE $49.00 FOR MTREIN/INDC, 3-CIT AND DEFT'S BALANCE $202.00 FOR BILL OF REVIEW SCANNED FEE SHEET (SFS) C-3021-03-F 07/06/2009 SCANNED FEE SHEET PLT'S BALANCE $49.00 FOR MTREIN/INDC, 3-CIT AND DEFT'S BALANCE $202.00 FOR BILL OF REVIEW SCANNED FEE SHEET (SFS) |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal, Signed C-3021-03-F 05/27/2008 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL SIGNED. DISP. ORDER OF DISMISSAL, SIGNED (OOD) Vol./Book 1308, Page 804 C-3021-03-F 05/27/2008 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL SIGNED. DISP. ORDER OF DISMISSAL, SIGNED (OOD) |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Disposition ($DISP) ($DISP) |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss, Filed C-3021-03-F 05/16/2008 Motion to Dismiss, F PLAINTIFFS Motion to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE,FILED(EA) Motion to Dismiss, FILED (MTDF) C-3021-03-F 05/16/2008 Motion to Dismiss, F PLAINTIFFS Motion to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE,FILED(EA) Motion to Dismiss, FILED (MTDF) |
|
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Settled C-3021-03-F 04/08/2008 CASE SETTLED IN MEDIATION; AOTBS. CASE SETTLED (CS) C-3021-03-F 04/08/2008 CASE SETTLED IN MEDIATION; AOTBS. CASE SETTLED (CS) |
|
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion C-3021-03-F 03/04/2008 Motion for Mediation,FILED(EA) MOTION (MOT) C-3021-03-F 03/04/2008 Motion for Mediation,FILED(EA) MOTION (MOT) |
|
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion C-3021-03-F 02/20/2008 MOTION FOR A BIFURCATED,FILED(EA) MOTION (MOT) C-3021-03-F 02/20/2008 MOTION FOR A BIFURCATED,FILED(EA) MOTION (MOT) |
|
January 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice C-3021-03-F 01/10/2008 NOTICE OF DELIVERY, FILED., (CUSTODIAN OF RECORD FOR ICON BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS, AMERICA ADMINISTRAITVE GROUP ANY AND ALL RECORDS $219.00) NOTICE (NOTICE) C-3021-03-F 01/10/2008 NOTICE OF DELIVERY, FILED., (CUSTODIAN OF RECORD FOR ICON BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS, AMERICA ADMINISTRAITVE GROUP ANY AND ALL RECORDS $219.00) NOTICE (NOTICE) |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY (CERTWD) Certificate of Written Discovery CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY (CERTWD) |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Signed C-3021-03-F 11/19/2007 ORDER, SIGNED ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Summary Judgment SIGNED. ORDER, SIGNED (OS) C-3021-03-F 11/19/2007 ORDER, SIGNED ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Summary Judgment SIGNED. ORDER, SIGNED (OS) |
|
November 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Ruling C-3021-03-F 11/16/2007 RULING PLAINTIFF'S MSJ DENIED. ALL PARTIES NOTIFIED BY PHONE. RULING (RULING) C-3021-03-F 11/16/2007 RULING PLAINTIFF'S MSJ DENIED. ALL PARTIES NOTIFIED BY PHONE. RULING (RULING) |
|
November 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss C-3021-03-F 11/15/2007 NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS: ON ICON BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS, AMERICA ADMINISTRATIVE GROUP(ANY & ALL RECORDS), FILED. NOTICE OF INTENT (NOI) C-3021-03-F 11/15/2007 NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS: ON ICON BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS, AMERICA ADMINISTRATIVE GROUP(ANY & ALL RECORDS), FILED. NOTICE OF INTENT (NOI) |
|
November 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference C-3021-03-F 11/15/2007 DOCKET CONTROL CONFE HELD. F/P/T=4/24/08; J/T=4/28/08 DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (DCC) C-3021-03-F 11/15/2007 DOCKET CONTROL CONFE HELD. F/P/T=4/24/08; J/T=4/28/08 DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (DCC) |
|
November 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) | |
November 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference C-3021-03-F 11/15/2007 DOCKET CONTROL CONFE HELD. F/P/T=4/24/08; J/T=4/28/08 BOTH @ 9:30 A.M. DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (DCC) C-3021-03-F 11/15/2007 DOCKET CONTROL CONFE HELD. F/P/T=4/24/08; J/T=4/28/08 BOTH @ 9:30 A.M. DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (DCC) |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion C-3021-03-F 10/15/2007 MOTION DEFENDANT'S Motion In Limine, FILED MOTION (MOT) C-3021-03-F 10/15/2007 MOTION DEFENDANT'S Motion In Limine, FILED MOTION (MOT) |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) | |
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Continuance, Signed C-3021-03-F 10/12/2007 ORDER GRANTING MOTIO DCC SET FOR 11/15/07 AT 2:00 P.M. ORDER GRANTING Motion for Continuance, SIGNED (OGMFC) C-3021-03-F 10/12/2007 ORDER GRANTING MOTIO DCC SET FOR 11/15/07 AT 2:00 P.M. ORDER GRANTING Motion for Continuance, SIGNED (OGMFC) |
|
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) (PLAINTIFF'S) (PLAINTIFF'S) |
|
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Called C-3021-03-F 09/06/2007 CASE CALLED P'S MSJ TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT CASE CALLED (CC) C-3021-03-F 09/06/2007 CASE CALLED P'S MSJ TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT CASE CALLED (CC) |
|
September 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Response C-3021-03-F 09/04/2007 RESPONSE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT FILED RESPONSE (RESPONSE) C-3021-03-F 09/04/2007 RESPONSE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT FILED RESPONSE (RESPONSE) |
|
August 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement, Filed C-3021-03-F 08/23/2007 Rule 11 Agreement FILED. Rule 11 Agreement (RULE11) C-3021-03-F 08/23/2007 Rule 11 Agreement FILED. Rule 11 Agreement (RULE11) |
|
August 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing Passed C-3021-03-F 08/22/2007 HEARING PASSED BY AGREEMENT AND RESET TO 9/6/07 AT 10:30 A.M. HEARING PASSED (HRGP) C-3021-03-F 08/22/2007 HEARING PASSED BY AGREEMENT AND RESET TO 9/6/07 AT 10:30 A.M. HEARING PASSED (HRGP) |
|
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Response C-3021-03-F 08/15/2007 RESPONSE DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Summary Judgment, FILED. RESPONSE (RESPONSE) C-3021-03-F 08/15/2007 RESPONSE DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Summary Judgment, FILED. RESPONSE (RESPONSE) |
|
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Objection C-3021-03-F 08/15/2007 OBJECTION DEFENDANT OBJECTIONS TO AND Motion to Strike AFFIDAVIT OF KEITH C. LIVESAY, FILED. OBJECTION (OBJ) C-3021-03-F 08/15/2007 OBJECTION DEFENDANT OBJECTIONS TO AND Motion to Strike AFFIDAVIT OF KEITH C. LIVESAY, FILED. OBJECTION (OBJ) |
|
July 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing C-3021-03-F 07/30/2007 ORDER SETTING HEARIN SIGNED - P'S M/S/J SET FOR 8/27/07 @ 10:30 A.M. - N/S. ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) C-3021-03-F 07/30/2007 ORDER SETTING HEARIN SIGNED - P'S M/S/J SET FOR 8/27/07 @ 10:30 A.M. - N/S. ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) |
|
June 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion for Reconsideration (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) OF DS' S/E'S OF DS' S/E'S |
|
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion for Summary Judgment C-3021-03-F 06/13/2007 ORDER DENYING MOTION SIGNED. ORDER DENYING Motion for Summary Judgment (ODMSJ) C-3021-03-F 06/13/2007 ORDER DENYING MOTION SIGNED. ORDER DENYING Motion for Summary Judgment (ODMSJ) |
|
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing C-3021-03-F 06/11/2007 ORDER SETTING HEARIN SIGNED. P'S M/RECONSIDER DS' S/E'S SET FOR 6/20/07 AT 10;00 A.M. N/S. ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) C-3021-03-F 06/11/2007 ORDER SETTING HEARIN SIGNED. P'S M/RECONSIDER DS' S/E'S SET FOR 6/20/07 AT 10;00 A.M. N/S. ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Ruling C-3021-03-F 06/08/2007 RULING DS' MSJ DENIED; ALL PARTIES NOTIFIED BY PHONE RULING (RULING) C-3021-03-F 06/08/2007 RULING DS' MSJ DENIED; ALL PARTIES NOTIFIED BY PHONE RULING (RULING) |
|
June 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Called C-3021-03-F 06/05/2007 CASE CALLED DS' MSJ TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT CASE CALLED (CC) C-3021-03-F 06/05/2007 CASE CALLED DS' MSJ TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT CASE CALLED (CC) |
|
June 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) | |
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Reply C-3021-03-F 06/04/2007 REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' Motion for Summary Judgment, FILED. REPLY (REPLY) C-3021-03-F 06/04/2007 REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' Motion for Summary Judgment, FILED. REPLY (REPLY) |
|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Objection C-3021-03-F 06/04/2007 OBJECTION DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO AND Motion to Strike AFFIDAVIT OF KEITH C. LIVESAT, FILED, OBJECTION (OBJ) C-3021-03-F 06/04/2007 OBJECTION DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO AND Motion to Strike AFFIDAVIT OF KEITH C. LIVESAT, FILED, OBJECTION (OBJ) |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed C-3021-03-F 05/29/2007 MOTION FOR SUMMARY J *PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Summary Judgment FILED Motion for Summary Judgment FILED. (MSJF) C-3021-03-F 05/29/2007 MOTION FOR SUMMARY J *PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Summary Judgment FILED Motion for Summary Judgment FILED. (MSJF) |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Response C-3021-03-F 05/29/2007 RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MOTINO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED RESPONSE (RESPONSE) C-3021-03-F 05/29/2007 RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MOTINO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED RESPONSE (RESPONSE) |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amended C-3021-03-F 05/29/2007 AMENDED *PLAINTIFF EMILIA JIMINEZ'S FIRST AMENDED BILL OF REVIEW, FILED. AMENDED (AME) C-3021-03-F 05/29/2007 AMENDED *PLAINTIFF EMILIA JIMINEZ'S FIRST AMENDED BILL OF REVIEW, FILED. AMENDED (AME) |
|
May 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion C-3021-03-F 05/25/2007 MOTION DEFENDANT'S Motion to Reconsider, FILED. MOTION (MOT) C-3021-03-F 05/25/2007 MOTION DEFENDANT'S Motion to Reconsider, FILED. MOTION (MOT) |
|
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Response C-3021-03-F 05/24/2007 RESPONSE DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Reconsideration, FILED. RESPONSE (RESPONSE) C-3021-03-F 05/24/2007 RESPONSE DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Reconsideration, FILED. RESPONSE (RESPONSE) |
|
May 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion for Reconsideration, Filed C-3021-03-F 05/18/2007 MOTION FOR RECONSIDE *PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Reconsideration, FILED. Motion for Reconsideration (MFR) C-3021-03-F 05/18/2007 MOTION FOR RECONSIDE *PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Reconsideration, FILED. Motion for Reconsideration (MFR) |
|
May 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition C-3021-03-F 05/11/2007 REPORTER'S CERTIFICA REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF LEO PRUNEDA REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION OF DEPOSITION: (REPCERT) C-3021-03-F 05/11/2007 REPORTER'S CERTIFICA REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF LEO PRUNEDA REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION OF DEPOSITION: (REPCERT) |
|
May 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition C-3021-03-F 05/11/2007 REPORTER'S CERTIFICA REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF EMILIA JIMENEZ REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION OF DEPOSITION: (REPCERT) C-3021-03-F 05/11/2007 REPORTER'S CERTIFICA REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF EMILIA JIMENEZ REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION OF DEPOSITION: (REPCERT) |
|
May 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Signed C-3021-03-F 05/01/2007 ORDER, SIGNED ORDER ON SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS SIGNED. ORDER, SIGNED (OS) C-3021-03-F 05/01/2007 ORDER, SIGNED ORDER ON SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS SIGNED. ORDER, SIGNED (OS) |
|
May 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Ruling C-3021-03-F 05/01/2007 RULING SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS SUSTAINED; BOTH PARTIES NOTIFIED BY PHONE RULING (RULING) C-3021-03-F 05/01/2007 RULING SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS SUSTAINED; BOTH PARTIES NOTIFIED BY PHONE RULING (RULING) |
|
May 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing C-3021-03-F 05/01/2007 ORDER SETTING HEARIN SIGNED. DS' MSJ SET FOR 6/5/07 AT 10;30 A.M. N/S. ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) C-3021-03-F 05/01/2007 ORDER SETTING HEARIN SIGNED. DS' MSJ SET FOR 6/5/07 AT 10;30 A.M. N/S. ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Called C-3021-03-F 04/11/2007 CASE CALLED DEF'S SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. CASE CALLED (CC) C-3021-03-F 04/11/2007 CASE CALLED DEF'S SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. CASE CALLED (CC) |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event | Def.'s Special Exceptions (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) | |
April 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Reply C-3021-03-F 04/10/2007 REPLY *DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS, FILED REPLY (REPLY) C-3021-03-F 04/10/2007 REPLY *DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS, FILED REPLY (REPLY) |
|
April 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Response C-3021-03-F 04/05/2007 RESPONSE *RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT THE FURNITURE MART, INC'S FIRST AMENDED SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S Petition for Bill of Review BY DEFENDANTS THE FURNITURE MART, INC AND COASTER COMPANY OF AMERICA, FILD RESPONSE (RESPONSE) C-3021-03-F 04/05/2007 RESPONSE *RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT THE FURNITURE MART, INC'S FIRST AMENDED SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S Petition for Bill of Review BY DEFENDANTS THE FURNITURE MART, INC AND COASTER COMPANY OF AMERICA, FILD RESPONSE (RESPONSE) |
|
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment C-3021-03-F 03/28/2007 MOTION FOR SUMMARY J DEFENDANT'S Motion for Summary Judgment, FILED. Motion for Summary Judgment (MSJ) C-3021-03-F 03/28/2007 MOTION FOR SUMMARY J DEFENDANT'S Motion for Summary Judgment, FILED. Motion for Summary Judgment (MSJ) |
|
March 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) (SET D'S S/E'S) (SET D'S S/E'S) |
|
March 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference C-3021-03-F 03/20/2007 DOCKET CONTROL CONFE HELD. F/P/T=10/15/07; J/T=10/22/07; D'S S/E'S SET FOR 4/11/07 AT 9:30 AM. DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (DCC) C-3021-03-F 03/20/2007 DOCKET CONTROL CONFE HELD. F/P/T=10/15/07; J/T=10/22/07; D'S S/E'S SET FOR 4/11/07 AT 9:30 AM. DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (DCC) |
|
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY (CERTWD) Certificate of Written Discovery CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY (CERTWD) |
|
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
First Amended C-3021-03-F 03/05/2007 FIRST AMENDED SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S Petition for Bill of Review BY DEFENDANTS THR FURNITURE MART, INC. AND COASTER COMPANY OF AMERICA, FILED. FIRST AMENDED (1ST) C-3021-03-F 03/05/2007 FIRST AMENDED SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S Petition for Bill of Review BY DEFENDANTS THR FURNITURE MART, INC. AND COASTER COMPANY OF AMERICA, FILED. FIRST AMENDED (1ST) |
|
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference C-3021-03-F 03/01/2007 DOCKET CONTROL CONFE SET FOR 3/20/07 @ 2:00 P.M. - N/S. DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (DCC) C-3021-03-F 03/01/2007 DOCKET CONTROL CONFE SET FOR 3/20/07 @ 2:00 P.M. - N/S. DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (DCC) |
|
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY (CERTWD) Certificate of Written Discovery CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY (CERTWD) |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery C-3021-03-F 02/23/2007 CERTIFICATE OF WRITT FILED. (BY HUMBERTO G. GARCIA) CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY (CERTWD) C-3021-03-F 02/23/2007 CERTIFICATE OF WRITT FILED. (BY HUMBERTO G. GARCIA) CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY (CERTWD) |
|
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery C-3021-03-F 02/21/2007 CERTIFICATE OF WRITT FILED. CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY (CERTWD) C-3021-03-F 02/21/2007 CERTIFICATE OF WRITT FILED. CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY (CERTWD) |
|
February 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Docket Control Conference C-3021-03-F 02/12/2007 REQUEST FOR DOCKET C PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (REQDCC) C-3021-03-F 02/12/2007 REQUEST FOR DOCKET C PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE (REQDCC) |
|
February 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Signed C-3021-03-F 02/01/2007 ORDER, SIGNED FROM 1/2/07 HEARING ORDER, SIGNED (OS) C-3021-03-F 02/01/2007 ORDER, SIGNED FROM 1/2/07 HEARING ORDER, SIGNED (OS) |
|
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate C-3021-03-F 01/19/2007 CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF'S SECOND CERTIFICATE OF DISCOVERY, FILED. CERTIFICATE (CERT) C-3021-03-F 01/19/2007 CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF'S SECOND CERTIFICATE OF DISCOVERY, FILED. CERTIFICATE (CERT) |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Other C-3021-03-F 01/04/2007 OTHER *NON-PARTY DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS FILED OTHER (OTH) C-3021-03-F 01/04/2007 OTHER *NON-PARTY DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS FILED OTHER (OTH) |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate C-3021-03-F 01/04/2007 CERTIFICATE *CERTIFICATION OF COURT COSTS FILED. (RIO GRANDE VALLEY ORTHOPEDIC CENTER $324.00) CERTIFICATE (CERT) C-3021-03-F 01/04/2007 CERTIFICATE *CERTIFICATION OF COURT COSTS FILED. (RIO GRANDE VALLEY ORTHOPEDIC CENTER $324.00) CERTIFICATE (CERT) |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate C-3021-03-F 01/04/2007 CERTIFICATE *CERTIFICATION OF COURT COSTS FILED (GREGORY S. GOLDSMITH,M.D. $348.20) CERTIFICATE (CERT) C-3021-03-F 01/04/2007 CERTIFICATE *CERTIFICATION OF COURT COSTS FILED (GREGORY S. GOLDSMITH,M.D. $348.20) CERTIFICATE (CERT) |
|
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Called C-3021-03-F 01/02/2007 CASE CALLED ORDERED TO ANSWER CASE CALLED (CC) C-3021-03-F 01/02/2007 CASE CALLED ORDERED TO ANSWER CASE CALLED (CC) |
|
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) ON D'S M/DET. THE SUFFICIENCY OF P'S RESP./OBJ. ON D'S M/DET. THE SUFFICIENCY OF P'S RESP./OBJ. |
|
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash C-3021-03-F 12/22/2006 MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE ORAL DEPOSITION OF LEO PRUNEDA, FILED. MOTION TO QUASH (MOTQUASH) C-3021-03-F 12/22/2006 MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE ORAL DEPOSITION OF LEO PRUNEDA, FILED. MOTION TO QUASH (MOTQUASH) |
|
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Response C-3021-03-F 12/19/2006 RESPONSE *PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DETERMINE SUFFICIENCY OF RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED RESPONSE (RESPONSE) C-3021-03-F 12/19/2006 RESPONSE *PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DETERMINE SUFFICIENCY OF RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED RESPONSE (RESPONSE) |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing C-3021-03-F 12/18/2006 ORDER SETTING HEARIN ON D'S M/DETERMINE THE SUFFICIENCY OF P'S RESPONSES/OBJECTIONS TO ADM. - SET FOR 1/2/07 @ 9:30 A.M. - N/S. ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) C-3021-03-F 12/18/2006 ORDER SETTING HEARIN ON D'S M/DETERMINE THE SUFFICIENCY OF P'S RESPONSES/OBJECTIONS TO ADM. - SET FOR 1/2/07 @ 9:30 A.M. - N/S. ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) |
|
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion C-3021-03-F 12/11/2006 MOTION DEFENDANT THE FURNITURE MART, INC.S MOTION TO DETERMINE THE SUFFICENCY OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS MOTION (MOT) C-3021-03-F 12/11/2006 MOTION DEFENDANT THE FURNITURE MART, INC.S MOTION TO DETERMINE THE SUFFICENCY OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS MOTION (MOT) |
|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Other C-3021-03-F 11/21/2006 OTHER NON-PARTY DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS, FILED. OTHER (OTH) C-3021-03-F 11/21/2006 OTHER NON-PARTY DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS, FILED. OTHER (OTH) |
|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss C-3021-03-F 11/21/2006 NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS, FILED. NOTICE OF INTENT (NOI) C-3021-03-F 11/21/2006 NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS, FILED. NOTICE OF INTENT (NOI) |
|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certification C-3021-03-F 11/21/2006 CERTIFICATION OF COURT COSTS, FILED. CERTIFICATION (CERTIFICATION) C-3021-03-F 11/21/2006 CERTIFICATION OF COURT COSTS, FILED. CERTIFICATION (CERTIFICATION) |
|
November 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement, Filed C-3021-03-F 11/13/2006 Rule 11 Agreement FILED. Rule 11 Agreement (RULE) C-3021-03-F 11/13/2006 Rule 11 Agreement FILED. Rule 11 Agreement (RULE) |
|
November 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing Passed C-3021-03-F 11/07/2006 HEARING PASSED HRG. ON M/PROTECTION PASSED BY Rule 11 Agreement. HEARING PASSED (HRGP) C-3021-03-F 11/07/2006 HEARING PASSED HRG. ON M/PROTECTION PASSED BY Rule 11 Agreement. HEARING PASSED (HRGP) |
|
November 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Return Receipt Received C-3021-03-F 11/06/2006 RETURN RECEIPT RECEI UNSERVED TO: COASTER COMPANY OF AMERICA, RETURN TO SENDER ,ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN , UNABLE TO FORWARD RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED (RRR) C-3021-03-F 11/06/2006 RETURN RECEIPT RECEI UNSERVED TO: COASTER COMPANY OF AMERICA, RETURN TO SENDER ,ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN , UNABLE TO FORWARD RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED (RRR) |
|
November 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Response C-3021-03-F 11/03/2006 RESPONSE DEFENDANT THE FURNITURE MART, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRODUCTION, FILED. RESPONSE (RESPONSE) C-3021-03-F 11/03/2006 RESPONSE DEFENDANT THE FURNITURE MART, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRODUCTION, FILED. RESPONSE (RESPONSE) |
|
November 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Special Exceptions C-3021-03-F 11/03/2006 SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS DEFENDANTS THE FURNITURE MART, INC. AND COASTER COMPANY OF AMERICA'S SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S BILL OF REVIEW, FILED. SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS (SPEX) C-3021-03-F 11/03/2006 SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS DEFENDANTS THE FURNITURE MART, INC. AND COASTER COMPANY OF AMERICA'S SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S BILL OF REVIEW, FILED. SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS (SPEX) |
|
November 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing C-3021-03-F 11/03/2006 ORDER SETTING HEARIN ON P'S M/PROTECTION - SET FOR 11/9/06 @ 9:30 A.M. - N/FAXED. ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) C-3021-03-F 11/03/2006 ORDER SETTING HEARIN ON P'S M/PROTECTION - SET FOR 11/9/06 @ 9:30 A.M. - N/FAXED. ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) |
|
November 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Response C-3021-03-F 11/02/2006 RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FURNITURE MART, INC.'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED. RESPONSE (RESPONSE) C-3021-03-F 11/02/2006 RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FURNITURE MART, INC.'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED. RESPONSE (RESPONSE) |
|
November 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate C-3021-03-F 11/01/2006 CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST CERTIFICATE OF DISCOVERY, FILED. CERTIFICATE (CERT) C-3021-03-F 11/01/2006 CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST CERTIFICATE OF DISCOVERY, FILED. CERTIFICATE (CERT) |
|
October 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion C-3021-03-F 10/23/2006 MOTION *MOTION FOR PROTECTION, FILED MOTION (MOT) C-3021-03-F 10/23/2006 MOTION *MOTION FOR PROTECTION, FILED MOTION (MOT) |
|
October 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery C-3021-03-F 10/02/2006 CERTIFICATE OF WRITT *CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY FILED CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY (CERTWD) C-3021-03-F 10/02/2006 CERTIFICATE OF WRITT *CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY FILED CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY (CERTWD) |
|
September 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Answer C-3021-03-F 09/28/2006 ANSWER DEFENDANT COASTER COMPANY OF AMERICA'S Original Answer, FILED. ANSWER (ANS) C-3021-03-F 09/28/2006 ANSWER DEFENDANT COASTER COMPANY OF AMERICA'S Original Answer, FILED. ANSWER (ANS) |
|
August 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation by Certified Mail, Issued (Fee) C-3021-03-F 08/24/2006 CITATION BY C/M ISSU TO: COASTER COMPANY OF AMERICA;C/O MAGGIE WRIGHT-ADJUSTER FOR AMERICAN FIRST INS COMP.(RRR) CITATION BY C/M ISSUED (CM.I) C-3021-03-F 08/24/2006 CITATION BY C/M ISSU TO: COASTER COMPANY OF AMERICA;C/O MAGGIE WRIGHT-ADJUSTER FOR AMERICAN FIRST INS COMP.(RRR) CITATION BY C/M ISSUED (CM.I) |
|
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Other C-3021-03-F 08/01/2006 OTHER CLLD MR. PRUNEDA'S OFFICE SPOKE W/MARICELA, ADVISED HER ON FEES FOR CM CIT. OTHER (OTH) C-3021-03-F 08/01/2006 OTHER CLLD MR. PRUNEDA'S OFFICE SPOKE W/MARICELA, ADVISED HER ON FEES FOR CM CIT. OTHER (OTH) |
|
July 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE SIGNED (ORD.SUBSERV) Order for Substitute Service ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE SIGNED (ORD.SUBSERV) |
|
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion C-3021-03-F 07/18/2006 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF PROCESS, FILED MOTION (MOT) C-3021-03-F 07/18/2006 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF PROCESS, FILED MOTION (MOT) |
|
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Return Receipt Received C-3021-03-F 05/12/2006 RETURN RECEIPT RECEI *SECRETARY OF STATE OF TEXAS SERVED ON 05/09/06 FILED RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED (RRR) C-3021-03-F 05/12/2006 RETURN RECEIPT RECEI *SECRETARY OF STATE OF TEXAS SERVED ON 05/09/06 FILED RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED (RRR) |
|
May 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Demand C-3021-03-F 05/09/2006 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY, FILED. DEMAND (DEMAND) C-3021-03-F 05/09/2006 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY, FILED. DEMAND (DEMAND) |
|
May 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Answer C-3021-03-F 05/09/2006 ANSWER *DEFENDANT THE FURNITURE MART, INC'S Original Answer FILED (ATTY. HUMBERTO G. GARCIA) ANSWER (ANS) C-3021-03-F 05/09/2006 ANSWER *DEFENDANT THE FURNITURE MART, INC'S Original Answer FILED (ATTY. HUMBERTO G. GARCIA) ANSWER (ANS) |
|
May 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Manual Check Issued C-3021-03-F 05/03/2006 MANUAL CHECK ISSUED $55.00 CK #31050 SECRETARY OF STATE MANUAL CHECK ISSUED (CHECK) C-3021-03-F 05/03/2006 MANUAL CHECK ISSUED $55.00 CK #31050 SECRETARY OF STATE MANUAL CHECK ISSUED (CHECK) |
|
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Tickler (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) (CHECK FOR ORDERS) (CHECK FOR ORDERS) |
|
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned C-3021-03-F 04/21/2006 CITATION RETURNED SERVED TO THE FURNITURE MART, INC./AGENT: PAUL HASS ON 4/19/06 CITATION RETURNED (CIT.R) C-3021-03-F 04/21/2006 CITATION RETURNED SERVED TO THE FURNITURE MART, INC./AGENT: PAUL HASS ON 4/19/06 CITATION RETURNED (CIT.R) |
|
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued C-3021-03-F 04/18/2006 CITATION ISSUED *ISSUED TO THE FURNITURE MART, INC AND COASTAL COMPANY OF AMERICA (P/U By:MARILYN STROUD CITATION ISSUED (CIT.I) Citation Issued C-3021-03-F 04/18/2006 CITATION ISSUED *ISSUED TO THE FURNITURE MART, INC AND COASTAL COMPANY OF AMERICA (P/U By:MARILYN STROUD CITATION ISSUED (CIT.I) |
|
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Bill of Review (OCA) C-3021-03-F 03/31/2006 BILL OF REVIEW FILED. BILL OF REVIEW (BILREVIEW) C-3021-03-F 03/31/2006 BILL OF REVIEW FILED. BILL OF REVIEW (BILREVIEW) |
|
March 20, 2006 | Docket Event | Motion for Reinstatement (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) | |
March 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Called C-3021-03-F 03/20/2006 CASE CALLED M/REINSTATE WITHDRAWN; BILL OF REVIEW TO BE FILED INSTEAD CASE CALLED (CC) C-3021-03-F 03/20/2006 CASE CALLED M/REINSTATE WITHDRAWN; BILL OF REVIEW TO BE FILED INSTEAD CASE CALLED (CC) |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing C-3021-03-F 03/09/2006 ORDER SETTING HEARIN SIGNED. M/REINSTATE SET FOR 3/20/06 AT 10:00 A.M. N/S. ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) C-3021-03-F 03/09/2006 ORDER SETTING HEARIN SIGNED. M/REINSTATE SET FOR 3/20/06 AT 10:00 A.M. N/S. ORDER SETTING HEARING (OSH) |
|
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Response C-3021-03-F 03/07/2006 RESPONSE DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED MOTION TO REINSTATE RESPONSE (RESPONSE) C-3021-03-F 03/07/2006 RESPONSE DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED MOTION TO REINSTATE RESPONSE (RESPONSE) |
|
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion to Reinstate Case, Filed C-3021-03-F 02/24/2006 MOTION TO REINSTATE PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED MOTION TO REINSTATE, FILED. MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE, FILED. (MTRIC) C-3021-03-F 02/24/2006 MOTION TO REINSTATE PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED MOTION TO REINSTATE, FILED. MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE, FILED. (MTRIC) |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate C-3021-03-F 03/11/2005 CERTIFICATE REPORTER'S CERTIFICATE ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF EMILIA JIMENEZ TAKEN DECEMBER 21, 2004, FILED CERTIFICATE (CERT) C-3021-03-F 03/11/2005 CERTIFICATE REPORTER'S CERTIFICATE ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF EMILIA JIMENEZ TAKEN DECEMBER 21, 2004, FILED CERTIFICATE (CERT) |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition C-3021-03-F 03/11/2005 REPORTER'S CERTIFICA EMILIA JIMENEZ 12.21.04 REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION OF DEPOSITION: (REPCERT) C-3021-03-F 03/11/2005 REPORTER'S CERTIFICA EMILIA JIMENEZ 12.21.04 REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION OF DEPOSITION: (REPCERT) |
|
December 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution, Signed C-3021-03-F 12/20/2004 ORDER OF DISMISSAL F DISP. ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION SIGNED (OODFWP) Vol./Book 983, Page 207 C-3021-03-F 12/20/2004 ORDER OF DISMISSAL F DISP. ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION SIGNED (OODFWP) |
|
December 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
File Sent to District Clerk FILE SENT TO DIST CLERK (FSTDC) FILE SENT TO DIST CLERK (FSTDC) |
|
December 17, 2004 | Docket Event | Status Conference Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) | |
December 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Called C-3021-03-F 12/17/2004 CASE CALLED AND ORDERED DISMISSED FOR WOP CASE CALLED (CC) C-3021-03-F 12/17/2004 CASE CALLED AND ORDERED DISMISSED FOR WOP CASE CALLED (CC) |
|
November 01, 2004 | Docket Event |
File Sent to District Clerk FILE SENT TO DIST CLERK (FSTDC) FILE SENT TO DIST CLERK (FSTDC) |
|
October 14, 2004 | Docket Event | Dismissal Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) | |
October 05, 2004 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement, Filed C-3021-03-F 10/05/2004 Rule 11 Agreement FILED. DWOP/STATUS HRG. RESET TO 12/17/04 Rule 11 Agreement (RULE11) C-3021-03-F 10/05/2004 Rule 11 Agreement FILED. DWOP/STATUS HRG. RESET TO 12/17/04 Rule 11 Agreement (RULE11) |
|
September 24, 2004 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing C-3021-03-F 09/24/2004 DWOP HEARING DWOP HEARING SET FOR 10/14/04 @ 9:00 A.M. DWOP HEARING (DWOP) C-3021-03-F 09/24/2004 DWOP HEARING DWOP HEARING SET FOR 10/14/04 @ 9:00 A.M. DWOP HEARING (DWOP) |
|
January 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
Answer C-3021-03-F 01/08/2004 ANSWER *DEFENDANTS' Original Answer, FILED (ATTY. HUMBERTO G. GARCIA) ANSWER (ANS) C-3021-03-F 01/08/2004 ANSWER *DEFENDANTS' Original Answer, FILED (ATTY. HUMBERTO G. GARCIA) ANSWER (ANS) |
|
December 29, 2003 | Docket Event |
Answer C-3021-03-F 12/29/2003 ANSWER DEFENDANT,THE FURNITURE MART,INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' Original Petition,FILED ANSWER (ANS) C-3021-03-F 12/29/2003 ANSWER DEFENDANT,THE FURNITURE MART,INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' Original Petition,FILED ANSWER (ANS) |
|
December 23, 2003 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned C-3021-03-F 12/23/2003 CITATION RETURNED COASTER COMPANY OF AMERICA BY SERVING STEPHEN BALLAS ON 12-17-03,FILED CITATION RETURNED (CIT.R) C-3021-03-F 12/23/2003 CITATION RETURNED COASTER COMPANY OF AMERICA BY SERVING STEPHEN BALLAS ON 12-17-03,FILED CITATION RETURNED (CIT.R) |
|
December 09, 2003 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned C-3021-03-F 12/09/2003 CITATION RETURNED THE FURNITURE MART, INC. SERVED ON 12/9/03, FILED CITATION RETURNED (CIT.R) C-3021-03-F 12/09/2003 CITATION RETURNED THE FURNITURE MART, INC. SERVED ON 12/9/03, FILED CITATION RETURNED (CIT.R) |
|
December 04, 2003 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued C-3021-03-F 12/04/2003 CITATION ISSUED TO THE FURNITURE MART INC., & COASTER CO. OF AMERICA PICKED UP BY: CITATION ISSUED (CIT.I) Citation Issued C-3021-03-F 12/04/2003 CITATION ISSUED TO THE FURNITURE MART INC., & COASTER CO. OF AMERICA PICKED UP BY: CITATION ISSUED (CIT.I) |