Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MARTINEZ, JOREL vs RASIER LLC et al
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX. Judge Christine Weems presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 28, 2022
Last Refreshed
January 02, 2023
Filing Location
Harris County, TX
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
20221229 - Amended Civil Process Request - Rasier
Date: Dec 29, 2022Civil Process Request - Uber Technologies
Date: Dec 29, 2022Civil Process Request - Melvin Washinton
Date: Dec 29, 2022Plaintiffs First Amended Petition
Date: Dec 29, 2022Request for Issuance of Service
Date: Dec 28, 2022Plaintiffs Original Petition Discovery Requests and Demand for Jury Trial
Date: Dec 28, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | 20221229 - Amended Civil Process Request - Rasier | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Process Request - Uber Technologies | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Process Request - Melvin Washinton | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's First Amended Petition | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance of Service | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Original Petition Discovery Requests and Demand for Jury Trial |