Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
IN THE INTEREST OF A.M. A CHILD
A Termination case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX. Judge Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 25, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Gregg County, TX
Judge
Hon. Womack, Tim
Category
Termination
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
Wrongful Termination
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Termination (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Womack, Tim)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition (OCA)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |