Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Matter of the Marriage of: Marson Vinyard and Matthew S. Trancucci
A Divorce - With Children case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX. Judge Darring, Anne B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 30, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Galveston County, TX
Filing Court House
306th District Court
Judge
Hon. Darring, Anne B.
Category
Divorce - With Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order - Post Judgment Family Motion - Final - OCA Order in Suit for Modification of Support Order and to Confirm Support Arrearage |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (unsigned) ORDER IN SUIT FOR MOD OF SUPPORT ORDER AND TO CONFIRM SUPPORT ARREARAGE |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
REDM Enforcement - Confirm CS Arrears & Mod $15 REDM- Suit for Modification of Support Order and Motion to Confirm Support Arrearage- GB |
|
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
AG Administrative Writ of Withholding/RFI - $15 Amended |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
AG Administrative Writ of Withholding/RFI - $15 Amended |
|
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Attorney General as Necessary Party | |
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Divorce Decree - Non Jury Trial - OCA /s/SPB |
|
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order for Consolidation with 10fd1857 |
|
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Transfer - Internal Case Transferred to 306th - to go with 10fd1857 |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Statement of Health Insurance Availability Health Insurance Availability Form |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Original Petition - OCA | |
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service |