Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Novella Bean v. Tangela Hamilton-Boyd
An Injury Or Damage Involving Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 23, 2023
Last Refreshed
August 28, 2023
Filing Location
Fort Bend County, TX
Category
Injury or Damage Involving Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Active
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed by the plaintiff, Novella Bean, against the defendant, Tangela Hamilton Boyd. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendant, resulting in a collision that caused substantial injuries to the…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index 4
Date: Aug 01, 2023Officers Return Index 3
Date: Jul 14, 2023Issuance Index 2
Date: Jun 28, 2023Petition Index 1
Date: Jun 23, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Demand Index # 5 Jury Demand Index # 5 |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4Defendant's Original Answer |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return of Citation for Tangela Hamilton-Boyd. Served on 07/13/2023. Officers Return Index # 3 Officers Return Index # 3Return of Citation for Tangela Hamilton-Boyd. Served on 07/13/2023. |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Tangela Hamilton-Boyd Issuance Index # 2 Issuance Index # 2Citatioin Issued to Tangela Hamilton-Boyd |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Citatione-serviceHamilton-Boyd, TangelaServed07/13/2023Returned07/14/2023 | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition Petition Index # 1 Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition |