Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Discover Bank v. Charles Hamilton, Jr
A Contract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 23, 2023
Last Refreshed
August 28, 2023
Filing Location
Fort Bend County, TX
Category
Contract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Issuance Index 3
Date: Jun 28, 2023Request Index 2
Date: Jun 23, 2023Petition Index 1
Date: Jun 23, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Charles Hamilton Jr. Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Charles Hamilton Jr. |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CitationeServiceHamilton, Charles, Jr Unserved | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Process Request Index # 2 Request Index # 2Request for Process |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition Petition Index # 1 Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition |