Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Prajee Investments vs Princeton Excess and Surplus Line Insurance Company
A Contract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 28, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 28, 2023
Filing Location
Fort Bend County, TX
Category
Contract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Removal
Overview
Causes of Action
representing Plaintiff in this cause of action.
Causes of Action:
COUNT 1:
COUNT 2:
COUNT 3:
COUNT 4:
COUNT 5:
COUNT 6:
COUNT 7:
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Removed to Federal Court Index 5
Date: Jul 06, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index 4
Date: Jun 28, 2021Issuance Index 3
Date: Jun 01, 2021Case Information Sheet
Date: May 28, 2021Request Index 2
Date: May 28, 2021Petition Index 1
Date: May 28, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Removal Removed to Federal Court Index # 5 Removed to Federal Court Index # 5Notice of Removal |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Removed to Federal Court Index # 5Notice of Removal | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant Princeton Excess and Surpluss Line Insurance Company's Original Answer to POP Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4Defendant Princeton Excess and Surpluss Line Insurance Company's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4Defendant Princeton Excess and Surpluss Line Insurance Company's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation - Princeton Excess and Surplus Line Insurance Company Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Princeton Excess and Surplus Line Insurance Company |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationeServicePrinceton Excess and Surplus Line Insurance Company Unserved | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Princeton Excess and Surplus Line Insurance Company | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet Case Information SheetCivil Case Information Sheet |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Process Request Request Index # 2 Request Index # 2Civil Process Request |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition Expedited Action Under TRCP 169 Petition Index # 1 Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition Expedited Action Under TRCP 169 |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Request Index # 2Civil Process Request | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition Expedited Action Under TRCP 169 |