Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Israel Thomas Villarreal VS Vincent Urquieta,Hertz Vehicles, LLC
An Injury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
El Paso County, TX
Category
Injury or Damage - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer Doc ID# 6 | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer Doc ID# 7 | |
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event | CitationUrquieta, VincentServed05/28/2019Response Received09/03/2019Returned06/04/2019 | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | CitationUrquieta, Vincent Unserved | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | CitationUrquieta, Vincent Returned Unserved 03/08/2019Returned03/08/2019 | |
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | CitationUrquieta, Vincent Unserved Hertz Vehicles, LLCServed12/26/2018Response Received09/03/2019Returned01/11/2019 | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1 | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | E-File Event Original Filing | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2 |