Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC vs VANESSA LUJAN
A Breach Of Contract case was filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, represented by Brandi Marie Addison, against Lujan, Vanessa, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX. Judge Garcia, Patrick M. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
El Paso County, TX
Judge
Category
Breach of Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Notice of Non-Suit
Status
Want of Prosecution
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Other Pleading Doc ID# 9
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.)
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 7
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitute Service Doc ID# 6
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.)
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 5
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
CitationLUJAN, VANESSA Returned Unserved 05/06/2019Returned05/06/2019
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Doc ID# 4
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request Doc ID# 3
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |