Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Matter of the Marriage Laura Reyes VS Paul Reyes, Jr.
A Divorce - No Children case was filed by Reyes, Laura Y, against Reyes, Paul A, Jr., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX. Judge Herrera, Mike presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 13, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
El Paso County, TX
Judge
Category
Divorce - No Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Divorce Decree
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (1:55 PM) (Judicial Officer Herrera, Mike) 10/01/2019Reset by Court to 12/16/2019
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Divorce Hearing (10:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Herrera, Mike)
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 5
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Herrera, Mike )
Judge: : Herrera, Mike |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition for Divorce Doc ID# 1
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Screening Instrument Doc ID# 3
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Herrera, Mike |