Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Matter of the Marriage Gabriela Verdier Soto VS Jose Emmanuel Soto And In The Interest Of: E.S. and N.S., Children
A Divorce - Children case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX. Judge Herrera, Mike presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
El Paso County, TX
Judge
Category
Divorce - Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Agreed Order
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Divorce Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Herrera, Mike)
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Doc ID# 6 (Judicial Officer: Herrera, Mike )
Judge: : Herrera, Mike |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
DC - Counter Petition/Cross Action/Counter Claim
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Doc ID# 5
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Screening Instrument Doc ID# 4
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition for Divorce Doc ID# 1
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3
Judge: Herrera, Mike |