Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LAMONTENEA CLINTEL JOHNSON vs. WALMART INC, et al
A Property case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX. Judge SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 23, 2023
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
Dallas County, TX
Filing Court House
191st District Court
Category
PROPERTY
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Removal
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Lamontenea Clintel Johnson against Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, and Eric Stuart Zorn. The plaintiff alleges that on June 17, 2021, while at a Walmart location in Dallas, Texas, they slipped on a s…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: Jul 13, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: Jul 10, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 16, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 16, 2023ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 23, 2023JURY DEMAND
Date: May 23, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: May 23, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - WALMART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - WALMART INC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
CITATION ERIC STUART ZORN |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
CITATION WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
CITATION WALMART, INC. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION ORIGINAL PETITION |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | JURY DEMAND | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION - WALMART, INC. ISSUE CITATION |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |