Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BRITT JACKSON vs. GENERAL MOTORS , LLC, et al
An Other (Civil) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX. Judge TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 26, 2022
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Dallas County, TX
Filing Court House
298th District Court
Category
OTHER (CIVIL)
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Removal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Jury Trial - Civil
Date: Jul 29, 2024Jury Trial - Civil
Date: Jan 08, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: Aug 29, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: Aug 21, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: Jul 14, 2023NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: Sep 16, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: Sep 12, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 29, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 24, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 24, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 23, 2022ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: Jul 26, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: Jul 26, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED PROTECTED ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT COVER LETTER & CIVIL DOCKET |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT GENERAL MOTORS LLC'S NOTICE THAT ACTION HAS BEEN REMOVED |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - GENERAL MOTORS, LLC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - GATEWAY BUICK GMC, LLC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
CITATION GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
CITATION GATEWAY BUICK GMC, LLC |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
CITATION GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
CITATION GENERAL MOTORS, LLC |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION - GATEWAY BUICK GMC, LLC ISSUE CITATION |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | JURY DEMAND | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |