Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ORA TURNER vs. WELLS FARGO BANK NA
A Property case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX. Judge MOORE, MARICELA presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 29, 2021
Last Refreshed
December 17, 2023
Filing Location
Dallas County, TX
Filing Court House
162nd District Court
Category
PROPERTY
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Removal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: Jan 11, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: Jan 11, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: Dec 31, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: Dec 31, 2021ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: Dec 31, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: Dec 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: Dec 29, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Temporary Injunction TEMP INJ |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT S NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL FEDERAL COURT NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT DEFENDANT S NOTICE OF REMOVAL |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT S ORIGINAL ANSWER - WELLS FARGO BANK ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | BOND FILED | |
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event | NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT | |
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
FIRM COVER LETTER CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE BOND APPROVAL FEE |
|
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER | |
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event | TRO HEARING | |
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Injunction | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED TRO NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |