Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Korean American Chamber of Commerce USA vs. Yonhi Kim, et al
An Other (Civil) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX. Judge WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 06, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 18, 2021
Filing Location
Dallas County, TX
Filing Court House
101st District Court
Category
OTHER (CIVIL)
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 10, 2019ORDER - STAY
Date: May 03, 2019Plea in Abatement
Date: Apr 26, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: Apr 26, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 24, 2019RESPONSE
Date: Apr 23, 2019MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: Apr 22, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 22, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 15, 2019PLEA IN ABATEMENT
Date: Apr 15, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: Apr 02, 2019MOTION - STAY
Date: Mar 21, 2019PLEA IN ABATEMENT
Date: Mar 21, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: Mar 06, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION HEARING *SET BY SUBMISSION *MTN SUBSTITUTE SERVICE *FILED 4-22-19 |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
101st Dismissal Letter - 2017 DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - STAY pending resolution 0f that certain matter pending in the Superior Court of Los Angeles California styled Korean American Chamber 0f Commerce USA v. David Kang, |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
2019.03.21 Verified Plea in Abatement Plea in Abatement TIFFANY SIMS 214-239-8900 - MOTION - STAY FILED 3/21/2019 - 30-MINUTES |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
2019.03.21 Motion to Stay MOTION HEARING TIFFANY SIMS 214-239-8900 - MOTION - STAY FILED 3/21/2019 - 30-MINUTES **CC RECEIVED 4-23-19** |
|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
2019.04.24 POrder - Stay NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
20190423 Order for Motion to Stay Response to Motion to Stay |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT CANCELLATION OF HEARING RE: CANCELLATION |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
20190422 Motion Sub Serve MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Citation by Rule 106 NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT AMENDED/ DEFENDANT S MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF FIRST-FILED CALIFORNIA CASE |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT AMENDED/ DEFENDANT S AMENDED VERIFIED PLEA IN ABATEMENT |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
2019.04.15 POrder - Amended Plea in Abatement NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT (YONHI KIM) AMD ORDER ABATEMENT |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
2019.04.15 Amended Verified Plea in Abatement PLEA IN ABATEMENT DF/ (YONHI KIM) AMENDED VERIFIED PLEA IN ABATEMENT |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION HEARING TIFFANY SIMS 214-239-8900 - MOTION - STAY FILED 3/21/2019 - 30-MINUTES |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
2019.04.02 Kim's Answer ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL DEFENDANT YONHI KIM'S VERIFIED ORIGINAL ANSWER, REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE, AND JURY DEMAND |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT RE: MOTION STAY |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT RE: PLEA IN ABATEMENT |
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
2019.03.21 Motion to Stay MOTION - STAY (YONHI KIM) PENDING RESOLUTION OF FIRST-FILED CALIFORNIA CASE **CC RECEIVED 4-23-19** |
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
2019.03.21 Verified Plea in Abatement PLEA IN ABATEMENT YONHI KIM |
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Temporary Injunction | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED CITATION - YONHI KIM |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED NOTICE- YONHI KIM |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - YONHI KIM |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
CITATION ESERVE |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF CORRECTED ORDER TRO TO PLTF CNSL |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE ESERVE |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ISSUE TRO | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | TRUST RECEIPT | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ESERVE |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ISSUE NOTICE | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (CORRECTED ORDER) |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition ORIGINAL PETITION |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE FILING COVER SHEET | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT TRO |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |