Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs JOHN W. CULVER
A Debt Claim case was filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., represented by Allen I. Amin, against Culver, John W., in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX. Judge Walker, James Judgment of $2,750.83Awarded To: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.Awarded Against: JOHN CULVER presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 30, 2022
Last Refreshed
September 26, 2023
Filing Location
Comal County, TX
Judge
Hon. Walker, James Judgment of $2,750.83Awarded To: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.Awarded Against: JOHN CULVER
Category
Debt Claim
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Walker, James) Parties Present Result: Default Judgment | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Comment | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation CULVER, JOHN W. Served 01/10/2023 Response Due 01/24/2023 Returned 01/18/2023 | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | JP Case Filed (JP OCA) | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation CULVER, JOHN W. Unserved |