Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
The Preserve at Singing Hills Residential Association, Inc. VS Patrick N. Bailey
A Contract - Breach Of Contract case was filed by The Preserve At Singing Hills Residential Association, Inc., represented by Brittany N Olsen, against Bailey , Patrick N., in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX. Judge Wright-Reneau, Tracie presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 27, 2022
Last Refreshed
September 26, 2023
Filing Location
Comal County, TX
Judge
Hon. Wright-Reneau, Tracie
Category
Contract - Breach of Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Notice of Non-Suit
Status
Want of Prosecution
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NONSUIT (Judicial Officer: Wright-Reneau, Tracie ) | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-SUIT | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PROCESS | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Bailey , Patrick N. Served 01/10/2023 Response Due 02/06/2023 Returned 01/17/2023 | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Bailey , Patrick N. Unserved |