Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL VS JANE DOE I ET AL Non-jury Trial
On March 12, 2024 an ir - pet/injunctive relief case was filed in the jurisdiction of Shelby County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 12, 2024
Last Refreshed
March 26, 2024
Filing Location
Shelby County, TN
Category
IR - Pet/Injunctive Relief
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2024 | hearing |
Petition
Judge: KYLE, JIM |
|
March 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Returns other (T) | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Memorandum (T) | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice without service | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Case set (T) | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Bond (T) | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Process issued other (T) | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | FIAT | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Order (T) | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion (T) | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Original complaint (T) | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit (T) |