Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bank Of America Na vs Deidre Goins , defendant, et al
On September 29, 2023 a foreclosure 420 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Richland County, SC. Judge Clerk Of Court C P, G S, And Family Court presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 29, 2023
Last Refreshed
October 12, 2023
Filing Location
Richland County, SC
Judge
Hon. Clerk Of Court C P, G S, And Family Court
Category
Common Pleas
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Service/Affidavit Of Service on Neighborhood Assistance Corp
Date: Oct 05, 2023ADR/Certificate of Exemption
Date: Sep 29, 2023Lis Pendens Filed
Date: Sep 29, 2023Summons Complaint
Date: Sep 29, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Service/Affidavit Of Service on Neighborhood Assistance Corp | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(10-05-2023 09:44:46 AM) Service/Affidavit Of Service | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Service/Affidavit Of Service on Deidre Goins on Deidre Goins | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice/Notice of Appearance | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ADR/Certificate of Exemption | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Lis Pendens Filed | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons & Complaint |