Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Nakia Thomas VS Lasonja Evans
On February 03, 2023 a motor veh accid 320 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hampton County, SC. Judge Clerk Of Court C P, G S, And Family Court presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 03, 2023
Last Refreshed
October 13, 2023
Filing Location
Hampton County, SC
Judge
Hon. Clerk Of Court C P, G S, And Family Court
Category
Common Pleas
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
NEF(09-14-2023 01:35:21 PM) Order/Publication
Date: Sep 14, 2023NEF(09-14-2023 03:09:24 PM) Order/Publication
Date: Sep 14, 2023Order/Publication
Date: Sep 14, 2023NEF(09-08-2023 11:14:54 AM) Order/Order Cover Sheet 25....
Date: Sep 08, 2023Motion/Petition for Order of Publication
Date: May 12, 2023NEF(05-12-2023 11:57:47 AM) Motion/Petition for Order of...
Date: May 12, 2023NEF(03-31-2023 08:21:18 AM) Answer/Answer and Jury Deman...
Date: Apr 03, 2023Notice/Underinsurance Carrier
Date: Mar 31, 2023Answer/Answer and Jury Demand
Date: Mar 31, 2023Summons Complaint
Date: Feb 03, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(09-14-2023 01:35:21 PM) Order/Publication | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(09-14-2023 03:09:24 PM) Order/Publication | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order/Publication | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(09-08-2023 11:14:54 AM) Order/Order Cover Sheet $25.... | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | 9/25/2023_MOTION_Notice of Motions Roster Publication Sent | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Order/Order Cover Sheet $25.00 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ADR/Alternative Dispute Resolution (Workflow) | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | 8/14/2023_MOTION_Notice of Motions Roster Publication Sent | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | 8/14/2023_MOTION_Notice of Motions Roster Publication Sent | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion/Compel | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(07-05-2023 08:52:41 AM) Motion/Compel | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion/Petition for Order of Publication | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(05-12-2023 11:57:47 AM) Motion/Petition for Order of... | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(03-31-2023 08:21:18 AM) Answer/Answer and Jury Deman... | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice/Underinsurance Carrier | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer/Answer and Jury Demand | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Add Party to Case | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons & Complaint |