Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
UNIFUND CCR VS DAVIDE BROCCOLI
A Civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 25, 2013
Last Refreshed
February 07, 2022
Filing Location
Kent County, RI
Category
Civil
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2013 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Passed |
|
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Passed | |
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation File for Dismissal | |
May 30, 2013 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Continued for Further Hearing |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
April 25, 2013 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Continued for Further Hearing |
|
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
March 21, 2013 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Continued for Further Hearing |
|
March 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
February 28, 2013 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Continued for Further Hearing |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Filed | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Filed | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Filed | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Data Entry |