Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NOI ST. ONGE VS KURT OHARA
A Tenant Restraining Order Against Landlord case was filed by St Onge, Noi, against Ohara, Kurt, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 25, 2013
Last Refreshed
February 07, 2022
Filing Location
Kent County, RI
Category
Tenant Restraining Order Against Landlord
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Applied | |
February 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
January 31, 2013 | hearing |
Hearing on Restraining Order - Tenant/Landlord Occurred |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Fails To Appear | |
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Event | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Granted | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Entered | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Data Entry | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Filed |