Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DISCOVER BANK VS KIM AMARAL
A Civil case was filed by Discover Bank, represented by Frechette, Laura, against Amaral, Kim, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 25, 2013
Last Refreshed
February 03, 2022
Filing Location
Kent County, RI
Category
Civil
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation File for Dismissal | |
June 04, 2013 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Enlarge Time to Answer Interrogatory Occurred |
|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Under Rule of Court | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Data Entry | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Filed |