Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STEWART VS PRICE ETAL
On November 30, 2023 a 3 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA. Judge JACQUINTO, CARMELLA presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 30, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 18, 2024
Filing Location
Philadelphia County, PA
Category
ASSAULT, BATTERY
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2024 |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED ANSWER WITH NEW MATTER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF WARREN T PRICE) |
||
December 21, 2023 | WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF | ||
December 21, 2023 | TRANSFERRED TO MAJOR JURY | ||
December 21, 2023 |
JURY TRIAL PERFECTED PRAECIPE TO PERFECT A JURY TRIAL FILED. 12 JURORS REQUESTED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF WARREN T PRICE) |
||
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
TRANSFERRED TO MAJOR JURY none. |
|
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
December 20, 2023 | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF KELLY J FOX FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF WARREN T PRICE) | ||
December 06, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON WARREN T PRICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 12/06/2023 FILED. |
||
November 30, 2023 | WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF | ||
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. |
|
November 30, 2023 | COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION | ||
November 30, 2023 | ACTIVE CASE | ||
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION none. |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2311060517 |
|