Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DISCOVER BANK VS SLACK
A Credit Card Collection case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA. Judge HANGLEY, MICHELE D presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 28, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 17, 2024
Filing Location
Philadelphia County, PA
Judge
Hon. HANGLEY, MICHELE D
Category
CREDIT CARD COLLECTION
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2024 | hearing |
ARBITRATION HEARING ARBITRATION CENTER 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR Judge: unassigned |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY TO NEW MATTER OF YVONNE E SLACK FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF DISCOVER BANK) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED ON BEHALF OF DISCOVER BANK. |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED ANSWER WITH NEW MATTER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF YVONNE E SLACK) |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF BRITTANY WESTON FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF YVONNE E SLACK) |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED SCHEDULED FOR ARBITRATION HEARING ON JUNE 5, 2024, AT 09:15 AM AT THE ARBITRATION CENTER, 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR. |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2307057992 |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION none. |
|