Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CSMC 2021-RPL7 TRUST VS SACKOSKY ETAL
On July 28, 2023 a 3 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA. Judge Lisette Shirdan-Harris presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 28, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 17, 2024
Filing Location
Philadelphia County, PA
Judge
Hon. Lisette Shirdan-Harris
Category
RESIDENTIAL OWNER OCCUPIED-MR
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF | ||
December 12, 2023 | ORDER-CONCILIATION CONCLUDED | ||
December 12, 2023 | NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 | ||
December 12, 2023 |
ORDER/FAILED TO APPEAR UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE INFORMATION PROVIDED TO THE COURT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT THIS MATTER IS REMOVED FROM THE CONCILIATION PROGRAM. ANY STAY IN EFFECT DUE TO BEING IN THE CONCILIATION PROGRAM IS LIFTED. THIS MATTER IS REMOVED FROM THE CONCILIATION PROGRAM FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: THE FAILURE OF DEFENDANT(S) TO APPEAR AT A SECOND OR SUBSEQUENT CONCILIATION CONFERENCE. PLAINTIFF CERTIFIES THAT THE COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER HAVE BEEN SERVED ON ALL DEFENDANTS AS REQUIRED BY THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND THAT THE AFFIDAVIT(S) OF SERVICE REFLECTING THIS HAS/HAVE BEEN PLACED ON THE DOCKET. AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND DECREED THAT: DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 02/05/2024 (MINIMUM OF 30 DAYS FROM TODAY?S DATE). IF NO RESPONSE IS WITHIN SUCH TIME, THEN PLAINTIFF MUST THEREAFTER SEND A NOTICE OF ITS INTENTION TO TAKE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO PA. R.C.P. 237.1 BEFORE TAKING A DEFAULT JUDGMENT. A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE SCHEDULED. THE CONFERENCE DOES NOT ALTER THE DEADLINE TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT. ?BY THE COURT: THOMAS-STREET, J., 12/08/2023 |
||
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER-CONCILIATION CONCLUDED none. |
|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 12-DEC-2023 OF ORDER/FAILED TO APPEAR ENTERED ON 12-DEC-2023. |
|
November 17, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF CONCILIATION CONFERENCE NOTICE AND FILED COMPLAINT UPON IRENE SACKOSKY AND FRANK SACKOSKY BY FIRST CLASS REGULAR MAIL ON 11/17/2023 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF CSMC 2021-RPL7 TRUST) |
||
November 06, 2023 | LISTED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
November 06, 2023 | NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 | ||
November 06, 2023 |
WAITING-LIST CONCL-SERV ISSUE UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE INFORMATION PROVIDED TO THE COURT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT THE COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER HAVING NOT BEEN SERVED ON DEFENDANT(S), THE FIRST CONCILIATION CONFERENCE IS CANCELLED AND RESCHEDULED TO DATE: 12/7/2023 at 1:00 P.M. DEFENDANT(S) MAY PARTICIPATE IN THE CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE OR ZOOM, IN ACCORDANCE WITH ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS, OR MAY APPEAR IN PERSON IN THE COURTROOM 676, CITY HALL, PHILADELPHIA, PA. **PLAINTIFF IS STAYED FROM ENTERING A DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) BEFORE ONE DAY AFTER THE SECOND CONCILIATION CONFERENCE OCCURS OR UNTIL SUCH TIME AS IS STATED IN THE SUBSEQUENT ORDER** BY THE COURT: S.T. STREET, J., 11/6/2023 |
||
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 07-NOV-2023 OF WAITING-LIST CONCL-SERV ISSUE ENTERED ON 06-NOV-2023. |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DATE 12/7/2023 at 1:00 P.M. COURTROOM 676 CITY HALL, PHILADELPHIA |
|
August 03, 2023 | CONCILIATION CONF SCHEDULED | ||
August 03, 2023 | NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 | ||
August 03, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED PURSUANT TO THE TERMS OF THE RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE DIVERSION PROGRAM ADOPTED BY JOINT GENERAL COURT REGULATION 2008-01, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED AS FOLLOWS: 1) SCHEDULING OF CONCILIATION CONFERENCE: A CONCILIATION CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 2, 2023 AT 1:00 P.M. DUE TO THE ONGOING COVID-19 PANDEMIC, THE DEFENDANT(S)-HOMEOWNER(S) MAY PARTICIPATE IN THE CONCILIATION CONFERENCE IN PERSON OR REMOTELY. THE ATTACHED ?HOW TO PARTICIPATE? SHEET OUTLINES THE WAYS TO PARTICIPATE. 2) SERVICE: PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER INCLUDING THE ?HOW TO PARTICIPATE? SHEET AND ?IMPORTANT NOTICE? ON DEFENDANT(S)-HOMEOWNER(S) TOGETHER WITH THE COMPLAINT AS REQUIRED BY PA.R.C.P. NO. 400.1. 3) JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT: AS PROVIDED BY SECTION 4 (F) OF JOINT GENERAL COURT REGULATION NO. 2008-01, IF THE COMPLAINT IS SERVED ON DEFENDANT(S) AS REQUIRED BY RULES OF COURT, BUT A RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS ARE NOT FILED AS REQUIRED BY PA.R.C.P. NO. 1026 AND 1028, THE PLAINTIFF MAY, AS APPROPRIATE, SERVE A ?TEN-DAY NOTICE? AS AUTHORIZED BY PA.R.C.P. NO. 237.1 ON DEFENDANT(S), BUT MAY NOT OBTAIN JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT UNTIL SUCH TIME AS THE COURT PERMITS IN AN ORDER FOLLOWING ONE OR MORE CONCILIATION CONFERENCES. PLAINTIFF MAY SEEK RELIEF FROM THIS PROVISION BY FILING A MOTION. 4) MEETING WITH HOUSING COUNSELOR: THE DEFENDANT(S)-HOMEOWNER(S) SHALL IMMEDIATELY CALL THE SAVE YOUR HOME PHILLY HOTLINE AT 215-334-HOME (215-334-4663), TO SCHEDULE AN APPOINTMENT TO DISCUSS WITH A HOUSING COUNSELOR AVAILABLE OPTIONS FOR RESOLUTION OF THE MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACTION. THE HOUSING COUNSELOR SHALL PREPARE A PROPOSAL AND SUBMIT IT TO PLAINTIFF?S ATTORNEY AS SOON AS POSSIBLE, PREFERABLY TEN (10) DAYS BEFORE THE DATE OF THE NEXT CONCILIATION CONFERENCE. THE FAILURE OF THE DEFENDANT(S)-HOMEOWNER(S) TO MEET WITH A HOUSING COUNSELOR OR CALL THE SAVE YOUR HOME PHILLY HOTLINE MAY RESULT IN THE ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED WITH THE ACTION AND THE ULTIMATE SALE OF THE PREMISES AT SHERIFF?S SALE. 5) CONCILIATION CONFERENCE: ALL PARTIES SHALL PARTICIPATE IN THE CONCILIATION CONFERENCE. A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE PLAINTIFF OR INVESTOR WHO HAS ACTUAL AUTHORITY TO MODIFY MORTGAGES, TO ENTER INTO ALTERNATE PAYMENT AGREEMENTS WITH THE DEFENDANT, OR TO OTHERWISE RESOLVE THE ACTION SHALL BE PRESENT AT THE CONCILIATION CONFERENCE OR SHALL BE AVAILABLE TELEPHONICALLY. AN ORDER WILL BE ISSUED FOLLOWING THE CONCILIATION CONFERENCE. BY THE COURT: HONORABLE IDEE C. FOX HONORABLE Lisette Shirdan-Harris President Judge Administrative Judge, Trial Division Court of Common Pleas Court of Common Pleas |
||
August 03, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON IRENE SACKOSKY AND FRANK SACKOSKY BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/01/2023 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF CSMC 2021-RPL7 TRUST) |
||
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 04-AUG-2023 OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED ENTERED ON 03-AUG-2023. |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
CONCILIATION CONF SCHEDULED none. |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. NOTICE OF INTENT UNDER ACT 6 HAS BEEN SENT TO THE DEFENDANT. |
|
July 28, 2023 | COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION | ||
July 28, 2023 | ACTIVE CASE | ||
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION none. |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2307056256 |
|