Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TEJADA VS HERNANDEZ ANDINO
On December 27, 2022 a 3 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA. Judge HANGLEY, MICHELE D presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 27, 2022
Last Refreshed
January 17, 2024
Filing Location
Philadelphia County, PA
Judge
Hon. HANGLEY, MICHELE D
Category
MOTOR VEHICLE ACCIDENT
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Stipulated Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2023 | hearing |
ARBITRATION HEARING ARBITRATION CENTER 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END SETTLED VIA S D & E PRAECIPE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF NEIL TEJADA) |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
FILE COPY PRINTED none. |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
SETTLED PRIOR TO ARBITRATION THE ARBITRATION CENTER HAVING BEEN ADVISED THAT THE WITHIN CASE HAS BEEN SETTLED, THE CASE SHALL BE MARKED "DISCONTINUED" ON THE PROTHONOTARY'S DOCKET AND REMOVED FROM THE APPLICABLE LIST AND INVENTORY OF PENDING CASES. THIS CASE MAY BE RESTORED TO THE ARBITRATION LIST ONLY UPON WRITTEN ORDER OF THE MOTION PROGRAM JUDGE. THIS RELIEF SHALL BE REQUESTED BY FORMAL MOTION. IT IS FURTHER DIRECTED THAT IN THE FOLLOWING TYPES OF CASES ADDITIONAL STEPS MUST BE TAKEN TO OFFICIALLY CONCLUDE THE CASE: MINOR'S COMPROMISES, INCOMPETENT/INCAPACITATED PERSON'S COMPROMISES, WRONGFUL DEATH/SURVIVAL ACTIONS (SEE PA. R.C.P. 2039,2064,2206, PHILA CIV. R. NO.2039.1, 2206, AND JOINT GENERAL COURT REGULATION 97-1) AND JOINDER (SEE PA. R.C.P. 2231). ARBITRATION CENTER MANAGEMENT. |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 10-APR-2023 OF SETTLED PRIOR TO ARBITRATION ENTERED ON 10-APR-2023. |
|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY TO NEW MATTER OF DENNIS A HERNANDEZ ANDINO FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF NEIL TEJADA) |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED ANSWER WITH NEW MATTER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF DENNIS A HERNANDEZ ANDINO) |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF CHRISTOPHER ACKLEY FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF DENNIS A HERNANDEZ ANDINO) |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF NEIL TEJADA) |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF NEIL TEJADA) |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED SCHEDULED FOR ARBITRATION HEARING ON OCTOBER 26, 2023, AT 09:15 AM AT THE ARBITRATION CENTER, 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR. |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2212049816 |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION none. |
|