Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA VS DEBAECKE
On October 20, 2022 a 3 case was filed by City Of Philadelphia, against Debaecke, Casey, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA. Judge unassigned presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 20, 2022
Last Refreshed
January 18, 2024
Filing Location
Philadelphia County, PA
Judge
Hon. unassigned
Category
REAL ESTATE TAX LIEN PETITION
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
General Tax
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO DISCONTINUE ORDER TO DISCONTINUE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF CITY OF PHILADELPHIA) |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 25-JAN-2023 OF CIVIL TAX RULE CONTINUED ENTERED ON 25-JAN-2023. |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
CIVIL TAX RULE CONTINUED PURSUANT TO THE REQUEST OF THE PARTIES, THE RULE HEARING IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER IS CONTINUED TO APRIL 26, 2023 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 676, CITY HALL, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA. |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR RULE RETURNABLE none. |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN none. |
|
January 25, 2023 | hearing |
RULE-CIVIL TAX PETITION CITY HALL COURTROOM 676 |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF RULE RETURNABLE UPON CASEY DEBAECKE BY POSTING PREMISES ON 12/10/2022 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF CITY OF PHILADELPHIA) |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AND RULE RETURNABLE UPON CASEY DEBAECKE BY CERTIFIED MAIL,FIRST CLASS REGULAR MAIL ON 11/16/2022 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF CITY OF PHILADELPHIA) |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION none. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR RULE RETURNABLE RULE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR RULE-CIVIL TAX PETITION ON JANUARY 25, 2023, AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 676, PHILADELPHIA, PA. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
CITY CHARGE none. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
AMENDED TAX CLAIM FILED AMENDED CLAIM FILED. FOR RULE INFORMATION, SEE RECORD. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2210040494 |
|