Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BOUATLAOUI VS HONG
On October 20, 2022 a 3 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA. Judge Linda A. Carpenter presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 20, 2022
Last Refreshed
January 19, 2024
Filing Location
Philadelphia County, PA
Category
MOTOR VEHICLE ACCIDENT
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Stipulated Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 | hearing |
PROJECTED TRIAL DATE CITY HALL COURTROOM 232 |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END SETTLED VIA S D & E PRAECIPE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF AHMED BOUATLAOUI) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED ON BEHALF OF AHMED BOUATLAOUI. |
|
October 06, 2023 | hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE VIA ADVANCED COMMUN. TECH. REMOTE HEARING |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 29-SEP-2023 OF SETTLED PRIOR TO ASSGN TRL JUD ENTERED ON 27-SEP-2023. |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
SETTLED PRIOR TO ASSGN TRL JUD THE COURT HAVING BEEN ADVISED THAT THE WITHIN CASE HAS BEEN SETTLED, THE CASE SHALL BE SO MARKED ON THE DOCKET AND REMOVED FROM THE APPLICABLE LIST AND INVENTORY OF PENDING CASES. IF THE INSTANT PROCEEDINGS INVOLVE AN APPEAL FROM A COMPULSORY ARBITRATION AWARD, ANY LIEN FROM THE ARBITRATION AWARD IS RELEASED. THIS CASE MAY BE RESTORED TO THE TRIAL LIST ONLY UPON WRITTEN ORDER OF THE TEAM/PROGRAM LEADER. THIS RELIEF SHALL BE REQUESTED BY FORMAL MOTION. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND DECREED THAT IN THE FOLLOWING TYPES OF CASES ADDITIONAL STEPS MUST BE TAKEN TO OFFICIALLY CONCLUDE THE CASE: MINOR'S COMPROMISES, INCOMPETENT/INCAPACITATED PERSON'S COMPROMISES, WRONGFUL DEATH/SURVIVAL ACTIONS (SEE PA. R.C.P. 2039, 2064, 2206, PHILA CIV. R. NO.2039.1, 2206, AND JOINT GENERAL COURT REGULATION 97-1) AND JOINDER (SEE PA. R.C.P. 2231). BY THE COURT: HON. LINDA CARPENTER, 9-27-2023. |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
SETTLEMENT CONF COMPLETED none. |
|
August 16, 2023 | hearing |
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CITY HALL DISPUTE RESOLUTION CTR RM 691 |
|
August 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN OF PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06-OCT-2023. |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF none. |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST PRE-TRIAL CONF none. |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 16-AUG-2023. |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATION FILED CERTIFICATE PREREQUISITE TO SERVICE OF SUBPOENAS PURSUANT TO RULE 4009.22 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF JIANG HONG) |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
CONFERENCE DATE SET none. |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF none. |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATION FILED CERTIFICATE PREREQUISITE TO SERVICE OF SUBPOENAS PURSUANT TO RULE 4009.22 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF JIANG HONG) |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR TRIAL none. |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER EXPEDITED TRACK - AND NOW, 05-JAN-2023, it is Ordered that: 1. The case management and time standards adopted for expedited track cases shall be applicable to this case and are hereby incorporated into this Order. 2. All discovery on the above matter shall be completed not later than 03-JUL-2023. 3. Plaintiff shall identify and submit curriculum vitae and expert reports of all expert witnesses intended to testify at trial to all other parties not later than 03-JUL-2023. 4. Defendant and any additional defendants shall identify and submit curriculum vitae and expert reports of all expert witnesses intended to testify at trial not later than 07-AUG-2023. 5. All pre-trial motions shall be filed not later than 07-AUG-2023. 6. A settlement conference may be scheduled at any time after 07-AUG-2023. Prior to the settlement conference all counsel shall serve all opposing counsel and file a settlement memorandum containing the following: (a) A concise summary of the nature of the case if plaintiff or of the defense if defendant or additional defendant;(b) A statement by the plaintiff or all damages accumulated, including an itemization of injuries and all special damages claimed by categories and amount; (c) Defendant shall identify all applicable insurance carriers, together with applicable limits of liability. 7. A pre-trial conference will be scheduled any time after 02-OCT-2023. Fifteen days prior to pre-trial conference, all counsel shall serve all opposing counsel and file a pre-trial memorandum containing the following: (a) A concise summary of the nature of the case if plaintiff or the defense if defendant or additional defendant; (b) A list of all witnesses who may be called to testify at trial by name and address. Counsel should expect witnesses not listed to be precluded from testifying at trial; (c) A list of all exhibits the party intends to offer into evidence. All exhibits shall be pre-numbered and shall be exchanged among counsel prior to the conference. Counsel should expect any exhibit not listed to be precluded at trial; (d) Plaintiff shall list an itemization of injuries or damages sustained together with all special damages claimed by category and amount. This list shall include as appropriate, computations of all past lost earnings and future lost earning capacity or medical expenses together with any other unliquidated damages claimed; and (e) Defendant shall state its position regarding damages and shall identify all applicable insurance carriers, together with applicable limits of liability; (f) Each counsel shall provide an estimate of the anticipated length of trial. 8. It is expected that the case will be ready for trial 06-NOV-2023, and counsel should anticipate trial to begin expeditiously thereafter. 9. All counsel are under a continuing obligation and are hereby ordered to serve a copy of this order upon all unrepresented parties and upon all counsel entering an appearance subsequent to the entry of this order. ...BY THE COURT: Linda Carpenter, J. |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 05-JAN-2023 OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED ENTERED ON 05-JAN-2023. |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF. none. |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED none. |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY TO NEW MATTER OF JIANG HONG FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF AHMED BOUATLAOUI) |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF none. |
|
January 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED ANSWER WITH NEW MATTER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF JIANG HONG) |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05-JAN-2023. |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF VINCENT J SAVINELLI FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF JIANG HONG) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05-JAN-2023. |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON JIANG HONG BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 12/09/2022 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF AHMED BOUATLAOUI) |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF AHMED BOUATLAOUI) |
|
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF AHMED BOUATLAOUI) |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL PERFECTED 12 JURORS REQUESTED. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY none. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2210040360 |
|
October 20, 2022 | WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF | ||
October 20, 2022 | JURY TRIAL PERFECTED | ||
October 20, 2022 | COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY | ||
October 20, 2022 | ACTIVE CASE |