Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CHALLAL VS LS TRUCKING SERVICES, LLC
On October 20, 2022 a 3 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA. Judge PADOVA, JOHN presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 20, 2022
Last Refreshed
January 17, 2024
Filing Location
Philadelphia County, PA
Judge
Hon. PADOVA, JOHN
Category
CONTRACTS OTHER
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
ATTEMPTED SERVICE - NOT FOUND LS TRUCKING SERVICES LLC NOT FOUND ON 11/03/2023. |
|
August 23, 2023 | hearing |
ARBITRATION HEARING ARBITRATION CENTER 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED RETURNED MAIL PRAECIPE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATED 6/27/23 AS UNDELIVERABLE AT THE ADDRESS ON FILE WITH THE COURT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTY: LS TRUCKING SERVICES LLC. |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT/FINAL DISP PRAECIPE FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED. JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF FARES CHALLAL AND AGAINST LS TRUCKING SERVICES LLC FOR FAILURE TO FILE ANSWER WITHIN REQUIRED TIME. PRO-PROTHONOTARY. NOTICE UNDER RULE 236 GIVEN. NOTICE UNDER 237.1 GIVEN. DAMAGES ASSESSED IN THE AMOUNT OF $15,000.00 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED. |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON LS TRUCKING SERVICES LLC BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 10/24/2022 FILED. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED SCHEDULED FOR ARBITRATION HEARING ON AUGUST 23, 2023, AT 09:15 AM AT THE ARBITRATION CENTER, 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2210040043 |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION none. |
|