Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JOHNSON VS WILFORD ETAL
On October 20, 2022 a 3 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA. Judge CARPENTER, LINDA presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 20, 2022
Last Refreshed
January 17, 2024
Filing Location
Philadelphia County, PA
Category
MOTOR VEHICLE ACCIDENT
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Bankruptcy
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
REMOVED FROM DEFERRED STATUS none. |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFERRED - BANKRUPTCY PRAECIPE TO DEFER CASE DUE TO PENDING BANKRUPTCY ACTION UNDER CASE NUMBER: 23-90054 (CL) (FILED ON BEHALF OF IEH AUTO PARTS LLC, ICAHN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC, IEH AUTO PARTS HOLDING LLC AND PEP BOYS - MANNY MOE & JACK LLC) |
|
November 06, 2023 | hearing |
PROJECTED TRIAL DATE CITY HALL COURTROOM 232 |
|
October 02, 2023 | hearing |
PROJECTED PRE-TRIAL CONF. DATE CITY HALL COURTROOM 232 |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
EVENT CANCELLED-CASE DEFERRED none. |
|
August 07, 2023 | hearing |
PROJECTED SETTLEMENT CONF DATE CITY HALL COURTROOM 232 |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFERRED - BANKRUPTCY PRAECIPE TO DEFER CASE DUE TO PENDING BANKRUPTCY ACTION UNDER CASE NUMBER: 23-90054 (FILED ON BEHALF OF IEH AUTO PARTS LLC, ICAHN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC, IEH AUTO PARTS HOLDING LLC AND PEP BOYS - MANNY MOE & JACK LLC) |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED RETURNED MAIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DATED 1/9/23 AS UNDELIVERABLE AT THE ADDRESS ON FILE WITH THE COURT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTY: SHAMLIN WILFORD. |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON SHAMLIN WILFORD BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 03/22/2023 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ROBIN JOHNSON) |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT UPON SHAMLIN WILFORD BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 03/20/2023 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ROBIN JOHNSON) |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ROBIN JOHNSON) |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ROBIN JOHNSON) |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY TO NEW MATTER OF IEH AUTO PARTS LLC FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ROBIN JOHNSON) |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ROBIN JOHNSON) |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATION FILED CERTIFICATE PREREQUISITE TO SERVICE OF SUBPOENAS PURSUANT TO RULE 4009.22 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF IEH AUTO PARTS LLC) |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED ANSWER WITH NEW MATTER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF IEH AUTO PARTS LLC) |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 09-JAN-2023 OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED ENTERED ON 09-JAN-2023. |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF. none. |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR TRIAL none. |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF none. |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED none. |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER EXPEDITED TRACK - AND NOW, 09-JAN-2023, it is Ordered that: 1. The case management and time standards adopted for expedited track cases shall be applicable to this case and are hereby incorporated into this Order. 2. All discovery on the above matter shall be completed not later than 03-JUL-2023. 3. Plaintiff shall identify and submit curriculum vitae and expert reports of all expert witnesses intended to testify at trial to all other parties not later than 03-JUL-2023. 4. Defendant and any additional defendants shall identify and submit curriculum vitae and expert reports of all expert witnesses intended to testify at trial not later than 07-AUG-2023. 5. All pre-trial motions shall be filed not later than 07-AUG-2023. 6. A settlement conference may be scheduled at any time after 07-AUG-2023. Prior to the settlement conference all counsel shall serve all opposing counsel and file a settlement memorandum containing the following: (a) A concise summary of the nature of the case if plaintiff or of the defense if defendant or additional defendant;(b) A statement by the plaintiff or all damages accumulated, including an itemization of injuries and all special damages claimed by categories and amount; (c) Defendant shall identify all applicable insurance carriers, together with applicable limits of liability. 7. A pre-trial conference will be scheduled any time after 02-OCT-2023. Fifteen days prior to pre-trial conference, all counsel shall serve all opposing counsel and file a pre-trial memorandum containing the following: (a) A concise summary of the nature of the case if plaintiff or the defense if defendant or additional defendant; (b) A list of all witnesses who may be called to testify at trial by name and address. Counsel should expect witnesses not listed to be precluded from testifying at trial; (c) A list of all exhibits the party intends to offer into evidence. All exhibits shall be pre-numbered and shall be exchanged among counsel prior to the conference. Counsel should expect any exhibit not listed to be precluded at trial; (d) Plaintiff shall list an itemization of injuries or damages sustained together with all special damages claimed by category and amount. This list shall include as appropriate, computations of all past lost earnings and future lost earning capacity or medical expenses together with any other unliquidated damages claimed; and (e) Defendant shall state its position regarding damages and shall identify all applicable insurance carriers, together with applicable limits of liability; (f) Each counsel shall provide an estimate of the anticipated length of trial. 8. It is expected that the case will be ready for trial 06-NOV-2023, and counsel should anticipate trial to begin expeditiously thereafter. 9. All counsel are under a continuing obligation and are hereby ordered to serve a copy of this order upon all unrepresented parties and upon all counsel entering an appearance subsequent to the entry of this order. ...BY THE COURT: Linda Carpenter, J. |
|
January 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN none. |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY(20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ROBIN JOHNSON) |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED ANSWER WITH NEW MATTER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ICAHN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC, IEH AUTO PARTS HOLDING LLC AND PEP BOYS - MANNY MOE & JACK LLC) |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN none. |
|
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 16-22123916 IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED BY AND BETWEEN THE BELOW SIGNED PARTIES THAT: 1. THE "BUT NOT LIMITED TO" LANGUAGE IS SUB-PARAGRAPH 10(J) OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT SHALL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2. WILFORD SHAMLIN WAS THE PERMISSIVE USER OF THE 2015 FORD FOCUS OWNED BY IEH AUTO PARTS, LLC; 3. WILFORD SHAMLIN WAS OPERATING THE 2015 FORD FOCUS IN THE COURSE AND SCOPE OF HIS EMPLOYMENT FOR IEH AUTO PARTS, LLC; 4. THE NEGLIGENCE ENTRUSTMENT ALLEGATIONS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO IN SUBPARAGRAPH 11(A) OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, ARE HERERBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. BY THE COURT: HON. LINDA CARPENTER, 12-21-2022. |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 22-DEC-2022 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 21-DEC-2022. |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION ASSIGNED 16-22123916 STIPULATION FILED ASSIGNED TO JUDGE: CARPENTER, LINDA . ON DATE: DECEMBER 20, 2022 |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FILED 16-22123916 STIPULATION TO PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE, AMEND CASE CAPTION, REMOVE VAGUE ALLEGATIONS & NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT CLAIM FILED. AWAITING JUDICIAL APPROVAL (FILED ON BEHALF OF ICAHN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC, IEH AUTO PARTS HOLDING LLC AND PEP BOYS - MANNY MOE & JACK LLC) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRANSFERRED TO MAJOR JURY none. |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL PERFECTED 12 JURORS REQUESTED. |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF CHARLES S TOOMEY AND ERICKA A ESPOSITO FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ICAHN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC, IEH AUTO PARTS HOLDING LLC AND PEP BOYS - MANNY MOE & JACK LLC) |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ROBIN JOHNSON) |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
SHERIFF'S SERVICE DEPUTIZED SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON PEP BOYS - MANNY MOE & JACK LLC AND IEH AUTO PARTS HOLDING LLC BY SHERIFF OF DAUPHIN COUNTY ON 11/28/2022. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ROBIN JOHNSON) |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
ATTEMPTED SERVICE - NOT FOUND ICAHN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC NOT FOUND ON 12/07/2022. |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
ATTEMPTED SERVICE - NOT FOUND SHAMLIN WILFORD NOT FOUND ON 11/22/2022. |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ROBIN JOHNSON) |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION none. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2210038897 |
|
October 20, 2022 | WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF | ||
October 20, 2022 | COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION | ||
October 20, 2022 | ACTIVE CASE |