Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NOEL VS MCCLATCHY
On October 20, 2022 a 3 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA. Judge JACQUINTO, CARMELLA presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 20, 2022
Last Refreshed
January 19, 2024
Filing Location
Philadelphia County, PA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Linda Carpenter;Category
MOTOR VEHICLE ACCIDENT
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Stipulated Judgment
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END SETTLED VIA S D & E PRAECIPE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RASHEED M NOEL) |
|
April 03, 2023 | NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 | ||
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
SETTLED PRIOR TO ASSGN TRL JUD THE COURT HAVING BEEN ADVISED THAT THE WITHIN CASE HAS BEEN SETTLED, THE CASE SHALL BE SO MARKED ON THE DOCKET AND REMOVED FROM THE APPLICABLE LIST AND INVENTORY OF PENDING CASES. IF THE INSTANT PROCEEDINGS INVOLVE AN APPEAL FROM A COMPULSORY ARBITRATION AWARD, ANY LIEN FROM THE ARBITRATION AWARD IS RELEASED. THIS CASE MAY BE RESTORED TO THE TRIAL LIST ONLY UPON WRITTEN ORDER OF THE TEAM/PROGRAM LEADER. THIS RELIEF SHALL BE REQUESTED BY FORMAL MOTION. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND DECREED THAT IN THE FOLLOWING TYPES OF CASES ADDITIONAL STEPS MUST BE TAKEN TO OFFICIALLY CONCLUDE THE CASE: MINOR'S COMPROMISES, INCOMPETENT/INCAPACITATED PERSON'S COMPROMISES, WRONGFUL DEATH/SURVIVAL ACTIONS (SEE PA. R.C.P. 2039, 2064, 2206, PHILA CIV. R. NO.2039.1, 2206, AND JOINT GENERAL COURT REGULATION 97-1) AND JOINDER (SEE PA. R.C.P. 2231). BY THE COURT: HON. LINDA CARPENTER, 4-3-2023. |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 04-APR-2023 OF SETTLED PRIOR TO ASSGN TRL JUD ENTERED ON 03-APR-2023. |
|
January 24, 2023 | NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 | ||
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 89-22125089 IT IS HEREBY AGREED AND STIPULATED TO BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AND COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT THAT THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT, ENTERED ON DECEMBER 22, 2022, IS OPENED. IT IS FUIRTHER AGREED AND STIPULATED THAT DEFENDANT WILL FILE THEIR ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON ACCEPTANCE OF THIS STIPULATION WITH THE COURT. BY THE COURT: HON. LINDA CARPENTER, 1-24-2023. |
|
January 24, 2023 | LISTED FOR TRIAL | ||
January 24, 2023 | LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF | ||
January 24, 2023 | LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF. | ||
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER EXPEDITED TRACK - AND NOW, 24-JAN-2023, it is Ordered that: 1. The case management and time standards adopted for expedited track cases shall be applicable to this case and are hereby incorporated into this Order. 2. All discovery on the above matter shall be completed not later than 07-AUG-2023. 3. Plaintiff shall identify and submit curriculum vitae and expert reports of all expert witnesses intended to testify at trial to all other parties not later than 07-AUG-2023. 4. Defendant and any additional defendants shall identify and submit curriculum vitae and expert reports of all expert witnesses intended to testify at trial not later than 04-SEP-2023. 5. All pre-trial motions shall be filed not later than 04-SEP-2023. 6. A settlement conference may be scheduled at any time after 04-SEP-2023. Prior to the settlement conference all counsel shall serve all opposing counsel and file a settlement memorandum containing the following: (a) A concise summary of the nature of the case if plaintiff or of the defense if defendant or additional defendant;(b) A statement by the plaintiff or all damages accumulated, including an itemization of injuries and all special damages claimed by categories and amount; (c) Defendant shall identify all applicable insurance carriers, together with applicable limits of liability. 7. A pre-trial conference will be scheduled any time after 06-NOV-2023. Fifteen days prior to pre-trial conference, all counsel shall serve all opposing counsel and file a pre-trial memorandum containing the following: (a) A concise summary of the nature of the case if plaintiff or the defense if defendant or additional defendant; (b) A list of all witnesses who may be called to testify at trial by name and address. Counsel should expect witnesses not listed to be precluded from testifying at trial; (c) A list of all exhibits the party intends to offer into evidence. All exhibits shall be pre-numbered and shall be exchanged among counsel prior to the conference. Counsel should expect any exhibit not listed to be precluded at trial; (d) Plaintiff shall list an itemization of injuries or damages sustained together with all special damages claimed by category and amount. This list shall include as appropriate, computations of all past lost earnings and future lost earning capacity or medical expenses together with any other unliquidated damages claimed; and (e) Defendant shall state its position regarding damages and shall identify all applicable insurance carriers, together with applicable limits of liability; (f) Each counsel shall provide an estimate of the anticipated length of trial. 8. It is expected that the case will be ready for trial 04-DEC-2023, and counsel should anticipate trial to begin expeditiously thereafter. 9. All counsel are under a continuing obligation and are hereby ordered to serve a copy of this order upon all unrepresented parties and upon all counsel entering an appearance subsequent to the entry of this order. ...BY THE COURT: Linda Carpenter, J. |
|
January 24, 2023 | CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED | ||
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 25-JAN-2023 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 24-JAN-2023. |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR TRIAL none. |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 24-JAN-2023 OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED ENTERED ON 24-JAN-2023. |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF. none. |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF none. |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED none. |
|
January 20, 2023 | MOTION ASSIGNED | ||
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION ASSIGNED 89-22125089 PETITION TO OPEN JUDGMENT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE: CARPENTER, LINDA . ON DATE: JANUARY 20, 2023 |
|
January 12, 2023 | NOTICE GIVEN | ||
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 24-JAN-2023. |
|
January 10, 2023 | LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF | ||
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
January 06, 2023 | WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF | ||
January 06, 2023 | TRANSFERRED TO MAJOR JURY | ||
January 06, 2023 | JURY TRIAL PERFECTED | ||
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY TO NEW MATTER OF BRIAN MCCLATCHY FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RASHEED M NOEL) |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED ANSWER WITH NEW MATTER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF BRIAN MCCLATCHY) |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL PERFECTED 8 JURORS REQUESTED. |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
TRANSFERRED TO MAJOR JURY none. |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FILED 89-22125089 STIPULATION TO OPEN DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED. AWAITING JUDICIAL APPROVAL (FILED ON BEHALF OF BRIAN MCCLATCHY) |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
PETITION TO OPEN JUDGMENT 89-22125089 RESPONSE DATE 01/17/2023. (FILED ON BEHALF OF BRIAN MCCLATCHY) |
|
December 23, 2022 | WAITING TO LIST ASSESSMENT | ||
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST ASSESSMENT none. |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT PRAECIPE FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED. JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF RASHEED M NOEL AND AGAINST BRIAN MCCLATCHY FOR FAILURE TO FILE ANSWER WITHIN REQUIRED TIME. PRO-PROTHONOTARY. NOTICE UNDER RULE 236 GIVEN. NOTICE UNDER 237.1 GIVEN. AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED. |
|
December 22, 2022 | NOTICE GIVEN | ||
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04-JAN-2023. |
|
December 20, 2022 | LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF | ||
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON BRIAN MCCLATCHY BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 10/29/2022 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RASHEED M NOEL) |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF ALBERT A GRIFFITH AND JOSHUA A HYMAN FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF BRIAN MCCLATCHY) |
|
October 20, 2022 | WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF | ||
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. |
|
October 20, 2022 | COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION | ||
October 20, 2022 | ACTIVE CASE | ||
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2210039573 |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION none. |
|