Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NEWLANE FINANCE COMPANY VS TRANSADA, INC. ETAL
On October 20, 2022 a 3 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 20, 2022
Last Refreshed
January 18, 2024
Filing Location
Philadelphia County, PA
Category
CONTRACTS (GOODS), ENFORCE
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO DISCONTINUE ORDER TO DISCONTINUE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF NEWLANE FINANCE COMPANY) |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED RETURNED MAIL SCHEDULING ORDER COMMERCE COURT DATED DECEMBER 8, 2022 AS UNDELIVERABLE AT THE ADDRESS ON FILE WITH THE COURT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTY: TRANSADA INC. |
|
December 09, 2022 | NOTICE GIVEN | ||
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 18-JAN-2023. |
|
December 07, 2022 | NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 | ||
December 07, 2022 | CONFERENCE DATE SET | ||
December 07, 2022 | LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF | ||
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
CONFERENCE DATE SET none. |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 07-DEC-2022 OF CONFERENCE DATE SET ENTERED ON 07-DEC-2022. |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON SRECKO RANKOVIC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/10/2022 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF NEWLANE FINANCE COMPANY) |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON TRANSADA INC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/14/2022 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF NEWLANE FINANCE COMPANY) |
|
October 20, 2022 | WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF | ||
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. |
|
October 20, 2022 | COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION | ||
October 20, 2022 | ACTIVE CASE | ||
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2210039357 |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION none. |
|