Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NORMENT VS FELDER
On October 07, 2022 a 3 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA. Judge PADOVA, JOHN presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 07, 2022
Last Refreshed
January 19, 2024
Filing Location
Philadelphia County, PA
Judge
Hon. PADOVA, JOHN
Category
MOTOR VEHICLE ACCIDENT
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2023 | hearing |
ARBITRATION HEARING ARBITRATION CENTER 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END SETTLED VIA S D & E PRAECIPE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF TIMOTHY NORMENT) |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF JULIANNE GARVEY FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ROBERT FELDER) |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF TIMOTHY NORMENT) |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF TIMOTHY NORMENT) |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2210010515 |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED SCHEDULED FOR ARBITRATION HEARING ON AUGUST 11, 2023, AT 09:15 AM AT THE ARBITRATION CENTER, 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR. |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION none. |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. |
|