Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WILLIAMS VS WHITTINGTON ETAL
On September 13, 2022 a 3 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA. Judge CARPENTER, LINDA presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 13, 2022
Last Refreshed
January 19, 2024
Filing Location
Philadelphia County, PA
Category
MOTOR VEHICLE ACCIDENT
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Stipulated Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2024 | hearing |
PROJECTED TRIAL DATE CITY HALL COURTROOM 232 |
|
December 04, 2023 | hearing |
PROJECTED PRE-TRIAL CONF. DATE CITY HALL COURTROOM 232 |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END SETTLED VIA S D & E PRAECIPE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
SETTLED PRIOR TO ASSGN TRL JUD THE COURT HAVING BEEN ADVISED THAT THE WITHIN CASE HAS BEEN SETTLED, THE CASE SHALL BE SO MARKED ON THE DOCKET AND REMOVED FROM THE APPLICABLE LIST AND INVENTORY OF PENDING CASES. IF THE INSTANT PROCEEDINGS INVOLVE AN APPEAL FROM A COMPULSORY ARBITRATION AWARD, ANY LIEN FROM THE ARBITRATION AWARD IS RELEASED. THIS CASE MAY BE RESTORED TO THE TRIAL LIST ONLY UPON WRITTEN ORDER OF THE TEAM/PROGRAM LEADER. THIS RELIEF SHALL BE REQUESTED BY FORMAL MOTION. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND DECREED THAT IN THE FOLLOWING TYPES OF CASES ADDITIONAL STEPS MUST BE TAKEN TO OFFICIALLY CONCLUDE THE CASE: MINOR'S COMPROMISES, INCOMPETENT/INCAPACITATED PERSON'S COMPROMISES, WRONGFUL DEATH/SURVIVAL ACTIONS (SEE PA. R.C.P. 2039, 2064, 2206, PHILA CIV. R. NO.2039.1, 2206, AND JOINT GENERAL COURT REGULATION 97-1) AND JOINDER (SEE PA. R.C.P. 2231). BY THE COURT: HON. LINDA CARPENTER, 10-12-2023 |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 17-OCT-2023 OF SETTLED PRIOR TO ASSGN TRL JUD ENTERED ON 12-OCT-2023. |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN OF PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 30-NOV-2023. |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF none. |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST PRE-TRIAL CONF none. |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED 70-23096470 MOTION IS CONTESTED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED 68-23096468 MOTION IS CONTESTED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY MOTION FILED 68-23096468 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. CERTIFICATION DUE DATE: 10/05/2023. RESPONSE DATE: 10/12/2023. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY MOTION FILED 70-23096470 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. CERTIFICATION DUE DATE: 10/05/2023. RESPONSE DATE: 10/12/2023. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
August 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION/PETITION MARKED MOOT |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
CONFERENCE CANCELLED CASE GOING TO MEDIATION.. |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 73-23060273 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER, DEFENDANTS SHALL PRESENT THE FOLLOWING WITNESSES FOR DEPOSITION: 1. CHEN NI 2. A CORPORATE DESIGNEE FROM DEFENDANT FEDEX AND DEFENDANT RCTC WITH THE MOST KNOWLEDGE OF THE SCREENING PROCESS IN PLACE WITH REGARD TO REVIEWING APPLICANTS FOR A DRIVER POSITION WITH FEDEX/RCTC DURING THE MONTH AND YEAR DEFENDANT WHITTINGTON WAS HIRED. 3. A CORPORATE DESIGNEE FROM DEFENDANT FEDEX AND DEFENDANT RCTC WITH THE MOST KNOWLEDGE OF THE TRAINING GIVEN BY DEFENDANT FEDX AND DEFENDANT RCTC TO DRIVERS DURING THE TIME FRAME WHITTINGTON WAS HIRED. 4. A CORPORATE DESIGNEE FROM DEFENDANT FEDEX AND DEFENDANT RCTC WITH THE MOST KNOWLEDGE OF POLICIES AND PROCEDURES CONCERNING DRUG TESTING FOLLOWING A MOTOR VEHICLE ACCIDENT....................BY THE COURT: CARPENTER, J. 06/21/2023 |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 21-JUN-2023 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 21-JUN-2023. |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION ASSIGNED 73-23060273 DISCOVERY MOTION FILED ASSIGNED TO JUDGE: CARPENTER, LINDA . ON DATE: JUNE 20, 2023 |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 08-JUN-2023 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 08-JUN-2023. |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 07-23054407 AND NOW, THIS 8TH DAY OF JUNE, 2023, UPON ONSIDERATION OF FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION AND ANY RESPONSES THERETO, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED THAT SAID MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF, RICHARD WILLIAMS, SHALL BE MADE AVAILABLE AND APPEAR FOR AN INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION TO BE PERFORMED BY LEONARD A. BRODY, M.D. WITHIN THIRTY DAYS OR RISK SANCTIONS UPON FURTHER APPLICATION TO THIS COURT..............BY THE COURT: CARPENTER, J. 6/8/23 |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION ASSIGNED 07-23054407 DISCOVERY MOTION FILED ASSIGNED TO JUDGE: CARPENTER, LINDA . ON DATE: JUNE 07, 2023 |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED 73-23060273 MOTION IS CONTESTED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY MOTION FILED 73-23060273 MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION. CERTIFICATION DUE DATE: 06/08/2023. RESPONSE DATE: 06/15/2023. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED 07-23054407 MOTION IS CONTESTED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RCTC SERVICES INC, FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC AND CHARLES WHITTINGTON) |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF none. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR TRIAL none. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
REVISED CASE MGMT ORDER ISSUED REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Be advised that the Case Management Order issued for the above-captioned action has been revised as follows: All discovery shall be completed not later than 05-SEP-2023. Plaintiff shall submit expert reports not later than 05-SEP-2023. Defendant shall submit expert reports not later than 02-OCT-2023. All pre-trial motions other than motions in limine shall be filed not later than 02-OCT-2023. A settlement conference will be scheduled any time after 02-OCT-2023. A pre-trial conference will be scheduled at any time after 04-DEC-2023. It is expected that this case shall be ready for trial by 02-JAN-2024. All other terms and conditions on the original Case Management Order will remain in full force and effect. ...BY THE COURT: Linda Carpenter, J. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF. none. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 26-MAY-2023 OF REVISED CASE MGMT ORDER ISSUED ENTERED ON 23-MAY-2023. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
OTHER EVENT CANCELLED none. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST SETTLMNT CONF none. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 26-MAY-2023 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 23-MAY-2023. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 70-23054070 AND NOW, THIS 23RD DAY OF MAY, 2023, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT THE MOTION FOR EXTRA RELIEF, ANY RESPONSE THERETO, IS GRANTED AND DEADLINES ARE EXTENDED 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS SHALL BE GRANTED ABSENT, EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES. BY THE COURT: HON. LINDA CARPENTER, 5-23-2023. |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION ASSIGNED 70-23054070 MOT-FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF ASSIGNED TO JUDGE: CARPENTER, LINDA . ON DATE: MAY 22, 2023 |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY MOTION FILED 07-23054407 MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION. CERTIFICATION DUE DATE: 05/30/2023. RESPONSE DATE: 06/06/2023. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RCTC SERVICES INC, FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC AND CHARLES WHITTINGTON) |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT MOTION IS SUBM BY AGRMT 64-23052164 MOTION IS SUBMITTED BY AGREEMENT. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOT-FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF 70-23054070 MOTION SUBMITTED JOINTLY (FILED ON BEHALF OF FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC) |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED 64-23052164 MOTION IS CONTESTED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03-AUG-2023. |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY MOTION FILED 64-23052164 MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION. CERTIFICATION DUE DATE: 05/17/2023. RESPONSE DATE: 05/24/2023. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
CONFERENCE DATE SET none. |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF none. |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 20-APR-2023 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 20-APR-2023. |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 11-23034811 AND NOW, THIS 18TH DAY OF APRIL, 2023, UPON PLAINTIFF RICHARD WILLIAMS' MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY IN SUPPORT OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIM, AND ANY RESPONSES THERETO, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO FILE AT THE APPROPRIATE TIME..................BY THE COURT: CARPENTER,J. 4/18/23 |
|
April 18, 2023 | hearing |
DISCOVERY HEARING VIA ADVANCED COMMUN. TECH. REMOTE HEARING |
|
April 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN-DISCOVERY HEARING none. |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR DISCOVERY HEARING 11-23034811 DISCOVERY MOTION FILED SCHEDULED FOR A HEARING ON APRIL 18, 2023 AT 09:00 AM IN REMOTE HEARING VIA ADVANCED COMMUN. TECH. |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR DISCOVERY HEARING 69-23034669 DISCOVERY MOTION FILED SCHEDULED FOR A HEARING ON APRIL 18, 2023 AT 09:00 AM IN REMOTE HEARING VIA ADVANCED COMMUN. TECH. |
|
April 06, 2023 | Motion |
DISCOVERY MOTION FILED Control No: 23034669 Date Received: 22-MAR-2023 |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED 11-23034811 ANSWER/RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION/PETITION. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RCTC SERVICES INC, FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC AND CHARLES WHITTINGTON) |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED 69-23034669 ANSWER/RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION/PETITION. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RCTC SERVICES INC, FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC AND CHARLES WHITTINGTON) |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED 11-23034811 MOTION IS CONTESTED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED 69-23034669 MOTION IS CONTESTED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY MOTION FILED 11-23034811 MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SERVE ASSET DISCOVERY. CERTIFICATION DUE DATE: 03/29/2023. RESPONSE DATE: 04/05/2023. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY MOTION FILED 69-23034669 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. CERTIFICATION DUE DATE: 03/29/2023. RESPONSE DATE: 04/05/2023. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 21-MAR-2023 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 16-MAR-2023. |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 83-23023783 AND NOW, THIS 16TH DAY OF MARCH, 2023, UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS, PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS, PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION THERETO, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT DEFENDANT'S PRELIMIARY OBJECTIONS ARE OVERRULED. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO THE PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN TWENTY DAYS OF THIS ORDER. THE PARTIES MAY LITIGATE THE ISSUES AND FILE APPRORIATE MOTIONS FOLLOWING DISCOVERY OR AT TRIAL. BY THE COURT: HON. LINDA CARPENTER, 3-16-2023. |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRELIM OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED 83-23023783 PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE: CARPENTER, LINDA . ON DATE: MARCH 13, 2023 |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO PRELIMINARY OBJCTNS 83-23023783 ANSWER IN OPPOSITION OF PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 59-23012259 UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, AND ANY RESPONSES THERETO, PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS, CHARLES WHITTINGTON, RCTC SERVICES, INC., AND FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC. SHALL PROVIDE ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF?S INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, AND SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ADDRESSED TO DEFENDANTS WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS OF THIS ORDER OR SUFFER APPROPRIATE SANCTIONS TO BE IMPOSED UPON FURTHER APPLICATION TO THE COURT. ....BY THE COURT: CARPENTER, J. 02/28/23 |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 03-MAR-2023 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 02-MAR-2023. |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 02/24/2023 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT MOTION IS SUBM BY AGRMT 59-23012259 MOTION IS SUBMITTED BY AGREEMENT. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS 83-23023783 PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. RESPONSE DATE: 03/09/2023 (FILED ON BEHALF OF FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC, RCTC SERVICES INC AND CHARLES WHITTINGTON) |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRELIM OBJECTIONS-MARKED MOOT 67-23011167 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED 01.30.2023 |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN-DISCOVERY HEARING none. |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY(20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR DISCOVERY HEARING 59-23012259 DISCOVERY MOTION FILED SCHEDULED FOR A HEARING ON FEBRUARY 28, 2023 AT 09:00 AM IN REMOTE HEARING VIA ADVANCED COMMUN. TECH. |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED 59-23012259 ANSWER/RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION/PETITION. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RCTC SERVICES INC, FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC AND CHARLES WHITTINGTON) |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED 59-23012259 MOTION IS CONTESTED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON CHARLES WHITTINGTON BY POSTING PREMISES ON 01/03/2023 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY MOTION FILED 59-23012259 MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. CERTIFICATION DUE DATE: 01/20/2023. RESPONSE DATE: 01/27/2023. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS 67-23011167 PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. RESPONSE DATE: 01/30/2023 (FILED ON BEHALF OF FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC, RCTC SERVICES INC AND CHARLES WHITTINGTON) |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRELIM OBJECTIONS-MARKED MOOT 05-22117005 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED 12.19.2022 |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY(20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 67-22121567 AND NOW, THIS 12TH DAY OF DECEMBER, 2022, UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID MOTION IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS' SHALL BE PREMITTED TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT, CHARLES WHITTINGTON, BY FORWARDING A COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT TO DEFENDANT, CHARLES WHITTINGTON VIA FIRST-CLASS MAIL, CERTIFICATE MAIL, AND POSTING THE COMPLAINT ON THE OUTSIDE ENTRANCE DOOR OF THE 1441 N. DOVER ST., PHILADELPHIA, PA 19121 ADDRESS. BY THE COURT: HON. LINDA CARPENTER, 12-12-2022. |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 14-DEC-2022 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 12-DEC-2022. |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION ASSIGNED 67-22121567 MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE: CARPENTER, LINDA . ON DATE: DECEMBER 07, 2022 |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE 67-22121567 MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF SUSAN R ENGLE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC, RCTC SERVICES INC AND CHARLES WHITTINGTON) |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER EXPEDITED TRACK - AND NOW, 02-DEC-2022, it is Ordered that: 1. The case management and time standards adopted for expedited track cases shall be applicable to this case and are hereby incorporated into this Order. 2. All discovery on the above matter shall be completed not later than 05-JUN-2023. 3. Plaintiff shall identify and submit curriculum vitae and expert reports of all expert witnesses intended to testify at trial to all other parties not later than 05-JUN-2023. 4. Defendant and any additional defendants shall identify and submit curriculum vitae and expert reports of all expert witnesses intended to testify at trial not later than 03-JUL-2023. 5. All pre-trial motions shall be filed not later than 03-JUL-2023. 6. A settlement conference may be scheduled at any time after 03-JUL-2023. Prior to the settlement conference all counsel shall serve all opposing counsel and file a settlement memorandum containing the following: (a) A concise summary of the nature of the case if plaintiff or of the defense if defendant or additional defendant;(b) A statement by the plaintiff or all damages accumulated, including an itemization of injuries and all special damages claimed by categories and amount; (c) Defendant shall identify all applicable insurance carriers, together with applicable limits of liability. 7. A pre-trial conference will be scheduled any time after 05-SEP-2023. Fifteen days prior to pre-trial conference, all counsel shall serve all opposing counsel and file a pre-trial memorandum containing the following: (a) A concise summary of the nature of the case if plaintiff or the defense if defendant or additional defendant; (b) A list of all witnesses who may be called to testify at trial by name and address. Counsel should expect witnesses not listed to be precluded from testifying at trial; (c) A list of all exhibits the party intends to offer into evidence. All exhibits shall be pre-numbered and shall be exchanged among counsel prior to the conference. Counsel should expect any exhibit not listed to be precluded at trial; (d) Plaintiff shall list an itemization of injuries or damages sustained together with all special damages claimed by category and amount. This list shall include as appropriate, computations of all past lost earnings and future lost earning capacity or medical expenses together with any other unliquidated damages claimed; and (e) Defendant shall state its position regarding damages and shall identify all applicable insurance carriers, together with applicable limits of liability; (f) Each counsel shall provide an estimate of the anticipated length of trial. 8. It is expected that the case will be ready for trial 02-OCT-2023, and counsel should anticipate trial to begin expeditiously thereafter. 9. All counsel are under a continuing obligation and are hereby ordered to serve a copy of this order upon all unrepresented parties and upon all counsel entering an appearance subsequent to the entry of this order. ...BY THE COURT: Linda Carpenter, J. |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF. none. |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED none. |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF none. |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 02-DEC-2022 OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED ENTERED ON 02-DEC-2022. |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR TRIAL none. |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS 05-22117005 PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. RESPONSE DATE: 12/19/2022 (FILED ON BEHALF OF FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC AND RCTC SERVICES INC) |
|
November 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02-DEC-2022. |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON RCTC SERVICES INC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/24/2022 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRELIM OBJECTIONS-MARKED MOOT 06-22102706 AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED 11.07.2022 |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY(20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS 06-22102706 PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS TO COMPLAINT FILED. RESPONSE DATE: 11/07/2022 (FILED ON BEHALF OF FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC AND CHARLES WHITTINGTON) |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICHARD WILLIAMS) |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL PERFECTED 12 JURORS REQUESTED. |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF BRYSON F DATT AND CLAIRE M COOKINHAM FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC, RCTC SERVICES INC AND CHARLES WHITTINGTON) |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRANSFERRED TO MAJOR JURY none. |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2209021816 |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION none. |
|
September 13, 2022 | WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF | ||
September 13, 2022 | COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION | ||
September 13, 2022 | ACTIVE CASE |