Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MAZZOTTA-PYLE, CATHERINE v. DUNN, GREGORY M
On November 21, 2023 a complaint civil action case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA. Judge GAIL A. WEILHEIMER presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 21, 2023
Last Refreshed
May 31, 2024
Filing Location
Montgomery County, PA
Filing Court House
Magisterial District
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Praec to Withdraw | |
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Cert of Service w/Rule Returnable | |
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Rule | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Brief | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer & New Matter by | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial by | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint Civil Action |