Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BEISER, JEFFREY v. BEISER, CAROLYN ERB
On July 02, 2023 a complaint for custody/visitation case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA. Judge PATRICIA E. COONAHAN presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 02, 2023
Last Refreshed
June 19, 2024
Filing Location
Montgomery County, PA
Filing Court House
Magisterial District
Category
Complaint for Custody/Visitation
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Custody,Visitation
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Short list | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Scheduling | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Scheduling | |
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Scheduling | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Conciliation Report | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Scheduling | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer & Counterclaim by | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Scheduling | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Scheduling | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Scheduling | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Custody Mediation Compliance Certification | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Attendance – Fee Paid | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Scheduling | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to Attend Parenting Seminar | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to Attend Mediation | |
July 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Praec to Attach | |
July 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint for Custody/Visitation |