Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Midland Funding Llc v. Guthridge, Connie
A case was filed by Midland Funding Llc, West Chester, against Guthridge, Connie, in the jurisdiction of Mifflin County, PA. Judge Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 01, 2008
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2022
Filing Location
Mifflin County, PA
Judge
Hon. Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Expired Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Connie Guthridge, Defendant |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Connie Guthridge, Defendant |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Connie Guthridge, Defendant |
|
January 11, 2008 | hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
January 01, 2008 | hearing |
Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Connie Guthridge, Defendant |
|
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Connie Guthridge, Defendant |
|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Midland Funding Llc Applies to Connie Guthridge, Defendant |
|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Derek Cory Blasker, Esq. Applies to Midland Funding Llc, Plaintiff |
|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Connie Guthridge, Defendant |
|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Connie Guthridge, Defendant |