Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Lvnv Funding, Llc/Assgn Citibank v. Steiner, Donald L.
A case was filed by Lvnv Funding, Llc Assgn Citibank, Scranton, against Steiner, Donald L., in the jurisdiction of Mifflin County, PA. Judge Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 15, 2008
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2022
Filing Location
Mifflin County, PA
Judge
Hon. Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2008 | hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
July 10, 2008 | hearing |
Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Dismissed Without Prejudice Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Donald L. Steiner, Defendant |
|
July 01, 2008 | hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Unsuccessfully Served Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Donald L. Steiner, Defendant |
|
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Issued via Hand Delivery Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Donald L. Steiner, Defendant |
|
June 13, 2008 | hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
June 03, 2008 | hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
May 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Undeliverable Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Donald L. Steiner, Defendant |
|
May 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Undeliverable Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Donald L. Steiner, Defendant |
|
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Philip C. Warholic, Esq. Applies to Lvnv Funding, Llc/Assgn Citibank, Plaintiff |
|
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Lvnv Funding, Llc/Assgn Citibank Applies to Donald L. Steiner, Defendant |
|
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Donald L. Steiner, Defendant |
|
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Donald L. Steiner, Defendant |